Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1102066

EP1102066 - Assay test system with temperature control means [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2001/21]Assay test system for regulating temperature
[2004/37]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.01.2006
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SE
published on 13.02.2008  [2008/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BAYER CORPORATION
100 Bayer Road
Pittsburgh, PA 15205 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/21]For all designated states
Bayer Corporation
100 Bayer Road
Pittsburgh, PA 15205 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Shareef, Nazeer H.
14617 Jackson Road
Mishawaka, IN 46544 / US
02 / Zuidema, Jack L.
53713 County Road 11 North
Elkhart, IN 46514 / US
 [2001/21]
Representative(s)Burkert, Frank , et al
Bayer Schering Pharma Aktiengesellschaft
Law and Patents
Patents and Licensing
Building Q 18
51368 Leverkusen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/21]Burkert, Frank , et al
Bayer AG, Konzernbereich RP Patente und Lizenzen
51368 Leverkusen / DE
Application number, filing date00123405.302.11.2000
[2001/21]
Priority number, dateUS1999044007515.11.1999         Original published format: US 440075
[2001/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1102066
Date:23.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/21]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1102066
Date:30.05.2001
[2001/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1102066
Date:23.03.2005
Language:EN
[2005/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.04.2001
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/48, G01N35/00, G01N21/00, B01L7/00
[2001/21]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/08]
Former [2001/21]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Temperierte Testvorrichtung[2001/21]
English:Assay test system with temperature control means[2004/37]
French:Dispositif d'essai avec reglage de temperature[2004/37]
Former [2001/21]Assay test system for regulating temperature
Former [2001/21]Dispositif d'enai thermostaté
Examination procedure30.11.2001Examination requested  [2002/05]
10.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.09.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.01.2005Fee for grant paid
18.01.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.12.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
21.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
22.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT23.03.2005
BE23.03.2005
CH23.03.2005
ES23.03.2005
FI23.03.2005
IT23.03.2005
LI23.03.2005
NL23.03.2005
TR23.03.2005
DK23.06.2005
GR23.06.2005
SE23.06.2005
PT07.09.2005
CY02.11.2005
IE02.11.2005
LU30.11.2005
MC30.11.2005
[2008/07]
Former [2007/35]AT23.03.2005
BE23.03.2005
CH23.03.2005
ES23.03.2005
FI23.03.2005
IT23.03.2005
LI23.03.2005
NL23.03.2005
TR23.03.2005
DK23.06.2005
GR23.06.2005
PT07.09.2005
CY02.11.2005
IE02.11.2005
LU30.11.2005
MC30.11.2005
Former [2007/20]AT23.03.2005
BE23.03.2005
CH23.03.2005
ES23.03.2005
FI23.03.2005
LI23.03.2005
NL23.03.2005
TR23.03.2005
DK23.06.2005
GR23.06.2005
PT07.09.2005
CY02.11.2005
IE02.11.2005
LU30.11.2005
MC30.11.2005
Former [2007/08]AT23.03.2005
BE23.03.2005
CH23.03.2005
ES23.03.2005
FI23.03.2005
LI23.03.2005
NL23.03.2005
TR23.03.2005
DK23.06.2005
GR23.06.2005
PT07.09.2005
IE02.11.2005
LU30.11.2005
MC30.11.2005
Former [2006/51]AT23.03.2005
BE23.03.2005
CH23.03.2005
FI23.03.2005
LI23.03.2005
NL23.03.2005
TR23.03.2005
DK23.06.2005
GR23.06.2005
PT07.09.2005
IE02.11.2005
MC30.11.2005
Former [2006/48]AT23.03.2005
BE23.03.2005
CH23.03.2005
FI23.03.2005
LI23.03.2005
NL23.03.2005
DK23.06.2005
GR23.06.2005
PT07.09.2005
IE02.11.2005
MC30.11.2005
Former [2006/30]AT23.03.2005
BE23.03.2005
CH23.03.2005
FI23.03.2005
LI23.03.2005
NL23.03.2005
DK23.06.2005
GR23.06.2005
PT07.09.2005
MC30.11.2005
Former [2006/14]AT23.03.2005
BE23.03.2005
CH23.03.2005
FI23.03.2005
LI23.03.2005
NL23.03.2005
DK23.06.2005
GR23.06.2005
PT07.09.2005
Former [2006/12]AT23.03.2005
BE23.03.2005
CH23.03.2005
FI23.03.2005
LI23.03.2005
DK23.06.2005
Former [2005/51]AT23.03.2005
BE23.03.2005
FI23.03.2005
Former [2005/46]FI23.03.2005
Documents cited:Search[X]DE3742786  (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-7,10 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE3441179  (DYNATECH DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * claim - *;
 [A]DE19610146  (BERTLING WOLF PROF DR [DE]) [A] * column A *