Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1099636

EP1099636 - Methods of manufacturing reclosable package having a slider device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.12.2005
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 18.01.2006  [2006/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Reynolds Consumer Products, Inc.
6603, West Broad Street Richmond
VA 23230 / US
[N/P]
Former [2003/38]For all designated states
Reynolds Consumer Products, Inc.
6603, West Broad Street
Richmond, VA 23230 / US
Former [2001/20]For all designated states
Reynolds Consumer Products, Inc.
6601 West Broad Street
Richmond, Virginia 23230-1701 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Buchman, James E.
W 8695 Spring Road
Hortonville, Wisconsin 54944 / US
 [2001/20]
Representative(s)Altenburg, Udo , et al
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/20]Altenburg, Udo, Dipl.-Phys. , et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle - Pagenberg - Dost - Altenburg - Geissler - Isenbruck, Galileiplatz 1
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date00123479.807.11.2000
[2001/20]
Priority number, dateUS19990164531P10.11.1999         Original published format: US 164531 P
US1999046785420.12.1999         Original published format: US 467854
[2001/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1099636
Date:16.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/20]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1099636
Date:04.09.2002
[2002/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1099636
Date:26.01.2005
Language:EN
[2005/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:B65B61/18, B65B9/08
[2001/20]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2003/21]
Former [2001/20]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum herstellen einer wiederverschliessbaren, mit Schieber versehenen Packung[2001/20]
English:Methods of manufacturing reclosable package having a slider device[2001/20]
French:Procede pour fabriquer un emballage refermable, dote d'un dispositif à glissiere[2001/20]
Examination procedure30.09.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.09.2002Examination requested  [2002/48]
15.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.05.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.09.2004Fee for grant paid
01.09.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.10.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
21.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
22.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]US5956924  (THIEMAN RONALD G [US]) [X] 1-3,6,12,13 * column W *
by applicantUS4240241
 US4246288
 US4437293
 US5063644
 US5301394
 US5442837
 US5664229
 US5713669