Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1095627

EP1095627 - Electrosurgical probe for surface treatment [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.10.2004
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.10.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.11.2004  [2004/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gyrus Medical, Inc.
13755 First Avenue North, Suite 500 Minneapolis
Minnesota 55441 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/34]For all designated states
Gyrus Medical, Inc.
13755 First Avenue North, Suite 500
Minneapolis, Minnesota 55441 / US
Former [2001/18]For all designated states
Everest Medical Corporation
13755 First Avenue North, Suite 500
Minneapolis, Minnesota 55441 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Latterell, Scott T.
2128 Penn Avenue South
Minneapolis, Minnesota 55405 / US
 [2001/18]
Representative(s)Kirschner, Klaus Dieter
Puschmann Borchert Bardehle
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft
Postfach 10 12 31
80086 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/18]Kirschner, Klaus Dieter, Dipl.-Phys.
Schneiders & Behrendt Rechtsanwälte - Patentanwälte Sollner Strasse 38
81479 München / DE
Application number, filing date00123573.827.10.2000
[2001/18]
Priority number, dateUS1999042822927.10.1999         Original published format: US 428229
[2001/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1095627
Date:02.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.02.2001
ClassificationInternational:A61B18/14
[2001/18]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2002/04]
Former [2001/18]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Elektrochirurgische Sonde zur Oberflächenbehandlung[2001/18]
English:Electrosurgical probe for surface treatment[2001/18]
French:Sonde électrochirurgicale pour le traitement de surfaces[2001/18]
Examination procedure02.11.2001Examination requested  [2002/01]
04.05.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/47]
18.06.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200304   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US5074313  (DAHL ROGER W [US], et al) [A] 1,15,21 * description fig 2 *;; figure 2 *;
 [A]US4156429  (AMUNDSON DAVID C [US]) [A] 1,15,21 * column 5, lines 42-46; figures 6,7 *;
 [DA]US5843019  (EGGERS PHILIP E [US], et al)
by applicantUS5843019