Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1096223

EP1096223 - Tilt sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.01.2006
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.10.2008Change - applicantpublished on 19.11.2008  [2008/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
[2008/47]
Former [2005/11]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Former [2001/18]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Ohaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ushihara, Masaharu
5-5-106, Fujisaka Nishimachi
Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-0158 / JP
02 / Katsuki, Nobuharu
16-112, Osumi Ogaki
Kyotanabe-shi, Kyoto 610-0343 / JP
 [2001/18]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/18]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date00123585.227.10.2000
[2001/18]
Priority number, dateJP1999030930129.10.1999         Original published format: JP 30930199
[2001/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1096223
Date:02.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1096223
Date:16.03.2005
Language:EN
[2005/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.02.2001
ClassificationInternational:G01C9/06, G01C9/12
[2001/18]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2002/04]
Former [2001/18]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Neigungssensor[2001/18]
English:Tilt sensor[2001/18]
French:Capteur d'inclinaison[2001/18]
Examination procedure13.06.2001Examination requested  [2001/32]
07.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.10.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.09.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.01.2005Fee for grant paid
14.01.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.12.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
30.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
27.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO9930110  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1-10 * abstract *;
 EP0961102  [ ] (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]);
 [Y]JPS61148320  ;
 [A]WO9928705  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract *;
 EP0964222  [ ] (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]);
 [A]EP0768513  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-10 * column 3, line 53 - column 4, line 27 * * column 5, line 39 - line 50; figures 1,2 *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861122), vol. 010, no. 348, Database accession no. (P - 519), [Y] 1-10 * abstract *