Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1109028

EP1109028 - Monitoring the residual charge of a battery [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.06.2006
Database last updated on 25.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.06.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.07.2006  [2006/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DaimlerChrysler AG
Epplestrasse 225
70567 Stuttgart / DE
[2004/44]
Former [2002/15]For all designated states
Conti Temic microelectronic GmbH
Sieboldstrasse 19
90411 Nürnberg / DE
Former [2001/25]For all designated states
DaimlerChrysler AG
Epplestrasse 225
70567 Stuttgart / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Schöner, Hans-Peter, Dr.
Eschenweg 3
64397 Modautal / DE
02 / Blessing, Alf, Dr.
Frühlingstrasse 41
73092 Heiningen / DE
 [2001/25]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2003/05]
Former [2001/25]Maute, Hans-Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing.
DaimlerChrysler AG, FTP/H, Postfach 35 35
74025 Heilbronn / DE
Application number, filing date00123604.128.10.2000
[2001/25]
Priority number, dateDE199916076116.12.1999         Original published format: DE 19960761
[2001/25]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1109028
Date:20.06.2001
Language:DE
[2001/25]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1109028
Date:04.06.2003
[2003/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1109028
Date:10.08.2005
Language:DE
[2005/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:G01R31/36
[2003/23]
Former International [2001/25]G01R31/26
Designated contracting statesFR,   GB,   IT [2004/09]
Former [2001/25]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Überwachung der Restladung und der Leistungsfähigkeit einer Batterie[2001/25]
English:Monitoring the residual charge of a battery[2001/25]
French:Contrôle de la charge résiduelle d'une batterie[2001/25]
Examination procedure28.10.2000Examination requested  [2001/25]
23.02.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.06.2005Fee for grant paid
07.06.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.05.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
26.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
07.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]US5828218  (YOKOO MASAHIDE [JP], et al) [A] 1-5,11,12 * column 2, line 6 - column 2, line 66; figure 6 *;
 [A]US5744931  (ARAI YOUICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 30; figure 5 *;
 [A]US5789923  (SHIMOYAMA KENICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * column 2, line 17 - column 2, line 43 *;
 [A]US5151865  (BLESSING ANDREAS [DE], et al) [A] 1 * figure 5 *