EP1097625 - Mowing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.02.2002 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.04.2002 [2002/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gerhard Dücker GmbH & Co. KG Landmaschinenfabrik Wendfeld 9 48703 Stadtlohn / DE | [2001/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dücker, Gerhard Wendfeld 9 48703 Stadtlohn / DE | [2001/19] | Representative(s) | Busse & Busse Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft Postfach 12 26 49002 Osnabrück / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/19] | Busse & Busse Patentanwälte Grosshandelsring 6 49084 Osnabrück / DE | Application number, filing date | 00123609.0 | 28.10.2000 | [2001/19] | Priority number, date | DE19992019431U | 04.11.1999 Original published format: DE 29919431 U | [2001/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1097625 | Date: | 09.05.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A01D34/86 | [2001/19] | CPC: |
A01D34/015 (EP);
A01D34/866 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2002/05] |
Former [2001/19] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Mähgerät | [2001/19] | English: | Mowing apparatus | [2001/19] | French: | Appareil faucheur | [2001/19] | Examination procedure | 12.02.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/15] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.01.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2002 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 23.01.2002 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4104851 (PERRY JAMES L) [Y] 2,4,5 * column 11, line 41 - column 12, line 21 *; | [XY]DE9300077U (EHRINGFELD) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 2,4,5; | [A]WO9309660 (HANSEN JAN MOERK [DK]); | [A]DE29716916U (DUECKER GERHARD GMBH & CO KG [DE]) |