Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1099797

EP1099797 - Compactor machine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  08.12.2006
Database last updated on 15.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2008Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 24.12.2008  [2008/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Benford Limited
The Cape, Warwick CV34 5DR / GB
[2001/20]
Inventor(s)01 / Stayner, Richard
c/o RMS Vibration Test Laboratory, 26 Coder Road
Ludlow Business Park, Ludlow SY9 1XE / GB
 [2001/20]
Representative(s)Wardley, Diana Mary
Forresters
Skygarden
Erika-Mann-Strasse 11
80636 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/20]Wardley, Diana Mary
Forrester & Boehmert, Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38
80801 München / DE
Application number, filing date00123664.530.10.2000
[2001/20]
Priority number, dateGB1999002682113.11.1999         Original published format: GB 9926821
[2001/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1099797
Date:16.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/20]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1099797
Date:04.09.2002
[2002/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1099797
Date:06.07.2005
Language:EN
[2005/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:E01C19/38, E02D3/046
[2002/36]
Former International [2001/20]E01C19/38, E02D3/074
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2005/25]
Former [2001/20]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verdichtungsgerät[2001/20]
English:Compactor machine[2001/20]
French:Compacteur[2001/20]
Examination procedure11.02.2003Examination requested  [2003/16]
03.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.11.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.04.2005Fee for grant paid
28.04.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  31.03.2006  19.04.2006  ADMISSIBLE
BOMAG GmbH
Hellerwald
56154 Boppard / DE
Opponent's representative
Lang, Friedrich, et al
Lang & Tomerius
Patentanwälte
Rosa-Bavarese-Strasse 5
80639 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2008/43]
Opponent(s)01  31.03.2006  19.04.2006  ADMISSIBLE
BOMAG GmbH
Hellerwald
56154 Boppard / DE
Opponent's representative
Lang, Friedrich, et al
Lang & Tomerius Patentanwälte Landsberger Strasse 300
80687 München / DE
Former [2006/23]
Opponent(s)01  31.03.2006  19.04.2006  ADMISSIBLE
BOMAG GmbH
Hellerwald
56154 Boppard / DE
Opponent's representative
Lang, Friedrich, et al
Patentanwälte Lang & Tomerius Postfach 15 13 24
80048 München / DE
22.08.2006Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
01.09.2006Legal effect of revocation of patent [2007/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
14.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
14.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT06.07.2005
BE06.07.2005
CH06.07.2005
FI06.07.2005
FR06.07.2005
IT06.07.2005
LI06.07.2005
NL06.07.2005
DK06.10.2005
GR06.10.2005
SE06.10.2005
ES17.10.2005
CY30.10.2005
LU31.10.2005
MC31.10.2005
IE01.11.2005
PT12.12.2005
DE03.05.2006
[2008/52]
Former [2008/40]AT06.07.2005
BE06.07.2005
CH06.07.2005
FI06.07.2005
IT06.07.2005
LI06.07.2005
NL06.07.2005
DK06.10.2005
GR06.10.2005
SE06.10.2005
ES17.10.2005
CY30.10.2005
FR31.10.2005
LU31.10.2005
MC31.10.2005
IE01.11.2005
PT12.12.2005
DE03.05.2006
Former [2007/35]AT06.07.2005
BE06.07.2005
CH06.07.2005
FI06.07.2005
IT06.07.2005
LI06.07.2005
NL06.07.2005
DK06.10.2005
GR06.10.2005
SE06.10.2005
ES17.10.2005
CY30.10.2005
LU31.10.2005
MC31.10.2005
IE01.11.2005
PT12.12.2005
DE03.05.2006
Former [2007/20]AT06.07.2005
BE06.07.2005
CH06.07.2005
FI06.07.2005
LI06.07.2005
NL06.07.2005
DK06.10.2005
GR06.10.2005
SE06.10.2005
ES17.10.2005
CY30.10.2005
LU31.10.2005
MC31.10.2005
IE01.11.2005
PT12.12.2005
DE03.05.2006
Former [2007/08]AT06.07.2005
BE06.07.2005
CH06.07.2005
FI06.07.2005
LI06.07.2005
NL06.07.2005
DK06.10.2005
GR06.10.2005
SE06.10.2005
ES17.10.2005
LU31.10.2005
MC31.10.2005
IE01.11.2005
PT12.12.2005
DE03.05.2006
Former [2006/48]AT06.07.2005
BE06.07.2005
CH06.07.2005
FI06.07.2005
LI06.07.2005
NL06.07.2005
DK06.10.2005
GR06.10.2005
SE06.10.2005
ES17.10.2005
MC31.10.2005
IE01.11.2005
PT12.12.2005
DE03.05.2006
Former [2006/36]AT06.07.2005
BE06.07.2005
CH06.07.2005
FI06.07.2005
LI06.07.2005
NL06.07.2005
DK06.10.2005
GR06.10.2005
SE06.10.2005
ES17.10.2005
MC31.10.2005
PT12.12.2005
DE03.05.2006
Former [2006/30]AT06.07.2005
BE06.07.2005
CH06.07.2005
FI06.07.2005
LI06.07.2005
NL06.07.2005
DK06.10.2005
GR06.10.2005
SE06.10.2005
ES17.10.2005
MC31.10.2005
PT12.12.2005
Former [2006/26]AT06.07.2005
BE06.07.2005
CH06.07.2005
FI06.07.2005
LI06.07.2005
NL06.07.2005
DK06.10.2005
GR06.10.2005
SE06.10.2005
ES17.10.2005
PT12.12.2005
Former [2006/25]AT06.07.2005
BE06.07.2005
CH06.07.2005
FI06.07.2005
LI06.07.2005
NL06.07.2005
GR06.10.2005
SE06.10.2005
ES17.10.2005
PT12.12.2005
Former [2006/22]AT06.07.2005
CH06.07.2005
FI06.07.2005
LI06.07.2005
NL06.07.2005
GR06.10.2005
SE06.10.2005
ES17.10.2005
PT12.12.2005
Former [2006/14]AT06.07.2005
CH06.07.2005
FI06.07.2005
LI06.07.2005
GR06.10.2005
SE06.10.2005
ES17.10.2005
PT12.12.2005
Former [2006/13]AT06.07.2005
FI06.07.2005
SE06.10.2005
Documents cited:Search[X]BE672035  (LOSENHAUSENWERK DÜSSELDORF) [X] 1-3,8-10 * the whole document *;
 [X]US4067244  (BAUMERS HANS) [X] 1,2,4,8-10 * column 3, line 41 - line 54; figure - *;
 [X]EP0054529  (VIPAC VIBRATOR AB [SE]) [X] 1,2,8-10 * page 3, paragraph 2 * * page 3, paragraph 5; figures 1A,1B,1C *;
 [A]DE2132700  (STAVOSTROJ NP) [A] 1,9 * column W *