Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1098000

EP1098000 - Embedded metallic deposits forming an electrode set for an electrochemical sensor strip [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.09.2008
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.09.2008Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 22.10.2008  [2008/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Roche Diagnostics Operations, Inc.
9115 Hague Road P.O. Box 50416
Indianapolis, IN 46250-0416 / US
[2006/36]
Former [2001/19]For all designated states
Roche Diagnostics Corporation
9115 Hague Road
Indianapolis, IN 46250 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Bhullar, Raghbir S.
6130 Chadsworth Way
Indianapolis, IN 46236 / US
 [2001/19]
Representative(s)Jung, Michael , et al
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Patentabteilung Sandhofer Strasse 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/19]Jung, Michael, Dr. , et al
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Patentabteilung
68298 Mannheim / DE
Application number, filing date00123693.431.10.2000
[2001/19]
Priority number, dateUS1999043362903.11.1999         Original published format: US 433629
[2001/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1098000
Date:09.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/19]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1098000
Date:08.10.2003
[2003/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.08.2003
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/00, H05K3/04, A61B5/00, G01N27/403, G01N27/28, G01N33/487, G01N33/543
[2003/28]
Former International [2001/19]C12Q1/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/19]
TitleGerman:Eingebettete Metallabscheidungen, die als Elektroden eines elektrochemischen Sensors dienen[2001/19]
English:Embedded metallic deposits forming an electrode set for an electrochemical sensor strip[2001/19]
French:Précipités de métal enfoncés, qui forment des électrodes d'un capteur eléctrochimique[2001/19]
Examination procedure31.10.2000Examination requested  [2001/19]
01.07.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.12.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.05.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/43]
04.06.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2008/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
14.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
14.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
12.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
12.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200708   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US3438127  (LEHTONEN EDWIN W) [X] 1,4,8,11,12,19,20 * column 1, line 14 - column 6, line 33; figures 1-12 *;
 [X]US4651417  (SCHUMACHER III JOHN E [US], et al) [X] 1,4,8,11,12,19,20 * abstract * * column 3, line 47 - column 4, line 10 *;
 [X]DE4438053  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5,8,9,11-13,15-21,23-26 * column 1, line 39 - column 5, line 34 * * column 8, line 60 - column 9, line 8 *;
 [X]US4223321  (KENWORTHY E J DOYLE) [X] 1,4,6,8,9,11,12,15,16,18-20,23-25,28 * abstract * * column 2, line 21 - line 22; figures 1-4 * * column 3, line 24 - column 4, line 30 *