Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1096014

EP1096014 - Catalytic domain of the human effector cell cycle checkpoint protein kinase, Chk1, materials and methods for identification of inhibitors thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.06.2007
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 07.01.2009  [2009/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Agouron Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
10350 North Torrey Pines Road
La Jolla, CA 92037 / US
[N/P]
Former [2006/34]For all designated states
AGOURON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
10350 North Torrey Pines Road
La Jolla, CA 92037 / US
Former [2001/18]For all designated states
Agouron Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
10350 North Torrey Pines Road
La Jolla, CA 92037 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Chen, Ping
7666 Pipit Place
San Diego, California 92129 / US
02 / Kan, Chen-Chen, Keck Graduate Inst. of A.L.S.
535 Watson Drive
Claremont, California 91711 / US
03 / Luo, Chun
3455 Iowa
Irvine, California 92206 / US
04 / Margosiak, Stephen
1555 South Upas Street
Escondido, California 92025 / US
05 / O'Connor, Patrick
3586 Torrey View Court
San Diego, California 92130 / US
06 / Tempczyk-Russel, Anna
4785 Caminito Borrego
San Diego, California 92130 / US
07 / Nguyen, Binh
4560 Vereda Mar de Ponderosa
San Diego, California 92130 / US
08 / Sarup, Jay Chand
7665 Palmilla Drive, Apt. 5224
San Diego, California 92122 / US
09 / Gaur, Smita
12570 Picrus Street
San Diego, California 92129 / US
10 / Anderson, Mark Brian
41 Las Cascadas
Orinda, California 94563 / US
11 / Deng, Ya-Li
13001 Caminito Bautizo
San Diego, California 92130 / US
12 / Lundgren, Karen
3833 Lamont Street, Apt. 2B
San Diego, California 92109 / US
13 / Register, James
Post Office Box 22899
San Diego, California 92192 / US
 [2001/18]
Representative(s)Hofmann, Harald , et al
Sonnenberg Fortmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Herzogspitalstrasse 10a
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/18]Hofmann, Harald , et al
Sonnenberg Fortmann, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Herzopgspitalstrasse 10
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date00123738.731.10.2000
[2001/18]
Priority number, dateUS19990162887P01.11.1999         Original published format: US 162887 P
US1999046042114.12.1999         Original published format: US 460421
[2001/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1096014
Date:02.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1096014
Date:25.09.2002
[2002/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1096014
Date:23.08.2006
Language:EN
[2006/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.08.2002
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/54, C12N9/12, C12Q1/34
[2001/18]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/18]
TitleGerman:Katalytische Domäne der menschlichen Effektor Zellzyklus Kontrollpunkt-proteinkinase Chk1, Materialien und Verfahren zur Identifizierung von Inhibitoren davon[2001/18]
English:Catalytic domain of the human effector cell cycle checkpoint protein kinase, Chk1, materials and methods for identification of inhibitors thereof[2001/18]
French:Domaines catalytiques d'effecteur protéine-kinase point de contrôle du cycle cellulaire Chk1, procédés et matériaux pour l'identification d'inhibiteurs de ceux-ci[2001/18]
Examination procedure27.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/18]
16.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.12.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.01.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.02.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.05.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.02.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.06.2006Fee for grant paid
20.06.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.05.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
06.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
06.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
07.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT23.08.2006
BE23.08.2006
CH23.08.2006
CY23.08.2006
FI23.08.2006
LI23.08.2006
NL23.08.2006
LU31.10.2006
MC31.10.2006
DK23.11.2006
SE23.11.2006
GR24.11.2006
PT24.01.2007
[2009/02]
Former [2008/36]AT23.08.2006
BE23.08.2006
CH23.08.2006
FI23.08.2006
LI23.08.2006
NL23.08.2006
LU31.10.2006
MC31.10.2006
DK23.11.2006
SE23.11.2006
GR24.11.2006
PT24.01.2007
Former [2008/19]AT23.08.2006
BE23.08.2006
CH23.08.2006
FI23.08.2006
LI23.08.2006
NL23.08.2006
MC31.10.2006
DK23.11.2006
SE23.11.2006
GR24.11.2006
PT24.01.2007
Former [2007/50]AT23.08.2006
BE23.08.2006
CH23.08.2006
FI23.08.2006
LI23.08.2006
NL23.08.2006
MC31.10.2006
DK23.11.2006
SE23.11.2006
PT24.01.2007
Former [2007/37]AT23.08.2006
BE23.08.2006
CH23.08.2006
FI23.08.2006
IT23.08.2006
LI23.08.2006
NL23.08.2006
MC31.10.2006
DK23.11.2006
SE23.11.2006
PT24.01.2007
Former [2007/35]AT23.08.2006
BE23.08.2006
CH23.08.2006
FI23.08.2006
IT23.08.2006
LI23.08.2006
NL23.08.2006
DK23.11.2006
SE23.11.2006
PT24.01.2007
Former [2007/28]AT23.08.2006
BE23.08.2006
CH23.08.2006
FI23.08.2006
LI23.08.2006
NL23.08.2006
DK23.11.2006
SE23.11.2006
PT24.01.2007
Former [2007/26]AT23.08.2006
CH23.08.2006
FI23.08.2006
LI23.08.2006
NL23.08.2006
DK23.11.2006
SE23.11.2006
PT24.01.2007
Former [2007/23]AT23.08.2006
CH23.08.2006
FI23.08.2006
LI23.08.2006
NL23.08.2006
DK23.11.2006
SE23.11.2006
Former [2007/22]CH23.08.2006
FI23.08.2006
LI23.08.2006
NL23.08.2006
DK23.11.2006
SE23.11.2006
Former [2007/19]CH23.08.2006
FI23.08.2006
LI23.08.2006
NL23.08.2006
SE23.11.2006
Former [2007/09]CH23.08.2006
FI23.08.2006
LI23.08.2006
SE23.11.2006
Former [2007/08]CH23.08.2006
LI23.08.2006
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO9911795  (ICOS CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,2,14-40 * the whole document * * Seq. Id. Nos. 1 and 2 show 100% and 99% identity to Seq. d. Nos. 1 and 2, respectively;; examples 1,6; claims 1-29 * [Y] 3-13,41;
 [XY]  SANCHEZ ET AL, "Conservation of the Chk1 checkpoint pathway in mammals: linkage of DNA damage to Cdk regulation through Cdc25", SCIENCE, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE,, US, (19970905), vol. 277, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 1497 - 1501, XP002119731 [X] 1,2,14-40 * the whole document * * hChk1 exhibits 100% and 99% identity to Seq. Id. Nos. 1 and 2, respectively.;; figures 1,4 * [Y] 3-13,41

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.277.5331.1497
 [Y]  JOHNSON L N ET AL, "The structural basis for substrate recognition and control by protein kinases", FEBS LETTERS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19980623), vol. 430, no. 1-2, ISSN 0014-5793, pages 1 - 11, XP004259128 [Y] 3-13,41 * table 1 * * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0014-5793(98)00606-1
 [X]  FORNWALD I C ET AL, "DEVELOPMENT AND CHARACTERIZATION OF A HIGH THROUGHPUT SCREEN FOR HUMAN CHECKPOINT KINASE, CHK1", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 90TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH. PHILADELPHIA, PA, APRIL 10 - 14, 1999, PROCEEDINGS OF THE ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, PHILADELPHIA, PA: AACR, US, (199903), vol. 40, page 406, XP000891503 [X] 40 * abstract *
 [A]  GILLILAND G L ET AL, "Crystallization of biological macromolecules for X-ray diffraction studies", CURRENT OPINION IN STRUCTURAL BIOLOGY, CURRENT BIOLOGY LTD., LONDON, GB, (199610), vol. 6, no. 5, ISSN 0959-440X, pages 595 - 603, XP002128062

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0959-440X(96)80024-8
 [PX]  CHEN P ET AL, "The 1.7 A crystal structure of human cell cycle checkpoint kinase Chk1: implications for Chk1 regulation.", CELL. UNITED STATES 17 MAR 2000, (20000317), vol. 100, no. 6, ISSN 0092-8674, pages 681 - 692, XP002207372 [PX] 1-41 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0092-8674(00)80704-7