Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1099367

EP1099367 - Supply device for wrapping material [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.01.2006
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SE
published on 13.02.2008  [2008/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Deere & Company
One John Deere Place
Moline, IL 61265 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/20]For all designated states
DEERE & COMPANY
One John Deere Place
Moline, Illinois 61265-8098 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Anstey, Henry Dennis
19684 Whiskey Ridge
Ottumwa, IA 51501 / US
02 / Phillips, Kenneth Graig
2621 Meadowdale
Ottumwa, IA 52501 / US
03 / Viaud, Jean
6, Rue Docteur Prieur
70100 Gray / FR
 [2001/20]
Representative(s)Magin, Ludwig Bernhard , et al
John Deere GmbH & Co. KG
Global Intellectual Property Services
John-Deere-Strasse 70
68163 Mannheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/20]Magin, Ludwig Bernhard , et al
Deere & Company European Office Patent Department
68140 Mannheim / DE
Application number, filing date00123785.802.11.2000
[2001/20]
Priority number, dateUS1999045207230.11.1999         Original published format: US 452072
US1999043993512.11.1999         Original published format: US 439935
[2001/20]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1099367
Date:16.05.2001
Language:DE
[2001/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1099367
Date:16.03.2005
Language:DE
[2005/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.03.2001
ClassificationInternational:A01F15/07
[2001/20]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/07]
Former [2001/20]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Hüllmittelzufuhrvorrichtung[2001/20]
English:Supply device for wrapping material[2001/20]
French:Dispositif d'alimentation de gaine pour enrubannage[2001/20]
Examination procedure16.11.2001Examination requested  [2002/03]
25.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.08.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.01.2005Fee for grant paid
10.01.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.12.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
01.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI16.03.2005
TR16.03.2005
DK16.06.2005
GR16.06.2005
SE16.06.2005
ES27.06.2005
PT07.09.2005
AT02.11.2005
CY02.11.2005
CH30.11.2005
LI30.11.2005
LU30.11.2005
MC30.11.2005
[2008/07]
Former [2007/23]FI16.03.2005
TR16.03.2005
DK16.06.2005
GR16.06.2005
ES27.06.2005
PT07.09.2005
AT02.11.2005
CY02.11.2005
CH30.11.2005
LI30.11.2005
LU30.11.2005
MC30.11.2005
Former [2007/20]FI16.03.2005
TR16.03.2005
DK16.06.2005
GR16.06.2005
ES27.06.2005
PT07.09.2005
CY02.11.2005
CH30.11.2005
LI30.11.2005
LU30.11.2005
MC30.11.2005
Former [2007/08]FI16.03.2005
TR16.03.2005
DK16.06.2005
GR16.06.2005
ES27.06.2005
PT07.09.2005
CH30.11.2005
LI30.11.2005
LU30.11.2005
MC30.11.2005
Former [2006/51]FI16.03.2005
TR16.03.2005
DK16.06.2005
GR16.06.2005
ES27.06.2005
PT07.09.2005
CH30.11.2005
LI30.11.2005
MC30.11.2005
Former [2006/42]FI16.03.2005
DK16.06.2005
GR16.06.2005
ES27.06.2005
PT07.09.2005
CH30.11.2005
LI30.11.2005
MC30.11.2005
Former [2006/30]FI16.03.2005
DK16.06.2005
GR16.06.2005
ES27.06.2005
PT07.09.2005
MC30.11.2005
Former [2006/14]FI16.03.2005
DK16.06.2005
GR16.06.2005
ES27.06.2005
PT07.09.2005
Former [2006/13]FI16.03.2005
DK16.06.2005
Former [2005/46]FI16.03.2005
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0931449  (DEERE & CO [US]) [X] 1,4,7 * column 6, line 13 - line 33 * * column 7, line 3 - line 15 * * column 9, line 16 - line 28 * * figures 2-5 * [Y] 5;
 [Y]US5216873  (RATZLAFF HOWARD J [US], et al) [Y] 5 * column 15, line 39 - column 16, line 14 * * figure 2 *;
 [PX]US6050052  (HERRON MAYNARD M [US], et al) [PX] 1,4,7 * column 12, line 29 - line 48 * * column 13, line 50 - line 59 * * figures 8-11 *;
 [X]EP0807380  (FORD NEW HOLLAND NV [BE]) [X] 1 * column 8, line 12 - line 39 * * figures 4,5 *
by applicantUS4787193