Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1099552

EP1099552 - Pneumatic sheet guiding device in a printing press [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.05.2005
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.06.2008Change - representativepublished on 23.07.2008  [2008/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG
Mülheimer Strasse 341
63075 Offenbach / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/20]For all designated states
MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG
Mühlheimer Strasse 341
63075 Offenbach / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Ehrhard, Toni
Am Ziegelgraben 11
64747 Breuberg / DE
02 / Watzl, Stefan
Kirchstrasse 42
63801 Kleinostheim / DE
03 / Haas, Hanns-Otto
Leibnizstrasse 12
63150 Heusenstamm / DE
04 / Hildebrandt, Frank
Lichtenplattenweg 24
63071 Offenbach / DE
05 / Eidam, Jörg, Dr.
Louis-Raverat-Strasse 12
63165 Mühlheim / DE
06 / Wallocha, Michael
Sudetenstrasse 6
64859 Eppertshausen / DE
07 / Faust, Paul-Ulrich
Wallufer Strasse 6
65197 Wiesbaden / DE
 [2001/20]
Representative(s)Stahl, Dietmar
manroland AG
Intellectual Property (IPB)
Postfach 10 12 64
63012 Offenbach am Main / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/30]Stahl, Dietmar
manroland AG Intellectual Property (IPB) Postfach 10 12 64
63012 Offenbach am Main / DE
Former [2001/20]Stahl, Dietmar
MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG, Abteilung RTB,Werk S Postfach 101264
63012 Offenbach / DE
Application number, filing date00123795.702.11.2000
[2001/20]
Priority number, dateDE199915439012.11.1999         Original published format: DE 19954390
[2001/20]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1099552
Date:16.05.2001
Language:DE
[2001/20]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1099552
Date:20.03.2002
[2002/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1099552
Date:21.07.2004
Language:DE
[2004/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.02.2002
ClassificationInternational:B41F25/00, B41F21/10
[2001/20]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2001/20]
TitleGerman:Pneumatische Bogenführungseinrichtung in einer Druckmaschine[2001/20]
English:Pneumatic sheet guiding device in a printing press[2001/20]
French:Dispositif guide-feuilles pneumatique dans une machine à imprimer[2001/20]
Examination procedure09.02.2002Examination requested  [2002/16]
08.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.02.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.02.2004Fee for grant paid
11.02.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.04.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
28.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY21.07.2004
FI21.07.2004
FR21.07.2004
GB21.07.2004
IE21.07.2004
IT21.07.2004
NL21.07.2004
TR21.07.2004
DK21.10.2004
GR21.10.2004
SE21.10.2004
ES01.11.2004
LU02.11.2004
BE30.11.2004
CH30.11.2004
LI30.11.2004
MC30.11.2004
PT21.12.2004
[2008/03]
Former [2007/35]CY21.07.2004
FI21.07.2004
FR21.07.2004
GB21.07.2004
IE21.07.2004
IT21.07.2004
NL21.07.2004
TR21.07.2004
DK21.10.2004
GR21.10.2004
SE21.10.2004
ES01.11.2004
LU02.11.2004
BE30.11.2004
CH30.11.2004
LI30.11.2004
MC30.11.2004
Former [2007/08]CY21.07.2004
FI21.07.2004
FR21.07.2004
GB21.07.2004
IE21.07.2004
NL21.07.2004
TR21.07.2004
DK21.10.2004
GR21.10.2004
SE21.10.2004
ES01.11.2004
LU02.11.2004
BE30.11.2004
CH30.11.2004
LI30.11.2004
MC30.11.2004
Former [2006/51]FI21.07.2004
FR21.07.2004
GB21.07.2004
IE21.07.2004
NL21.07.2004
TR21.07.2004
DK21.10.2004
GR21.10.2004
SE21.10.2004
ES01.11.2004
BE30.11.2004
CH30.11.2004
LI30.11.2004
MC30.11.2004
Former [2006/32]FI21.07.2004
FR21.07.2004
GB21.07.2004
IE21.07.2004
NL21.07.2004
DK21.10.2004
GR21.10.2004
SE21.10.2004
ES01.11.2004
BE30.11.2004
CH30.11.2004
LI30.11.2004
MC30.11.2004
Former [2006/23]FI21.07.2004
GB21.07.2004
IE21.07.2004
NL21.07.2004
DK21.10.2004
GR21.10.2004
SE21.10.2004
ES01.11.2004
BE30.11.2004
CH30.11.2004
LI30.11.2004
MC30.11.2004
Former [2006/12]FI21.07.2004
GB21.07.2004
IE21.07.2004
DK21.10.2004
GR21.10.2004
SE21.10.2004
ES01.11.2004
BE30.11.2004
CH30.11.2004
LI30.11.2004
MC30.11.2004
Former [2005/51]FI21.07.2004
GB21.07.2004
IE21.07.2004
DK21.10.2004
GR21.10.2004
SE21.10.2004
ES01.11.2004
BE30.11.2004
MC30.11.2004
Former [2005/48]FI21.07.2004
GB21.07.2004
IE21.07.2004
DK21.10.2004
GR21.10.2004
SE21.10.2004
ES01.11.2004
MC30.11.2004
Former [2005/45]FI21.07.2004
GB21.07.2004
IE21.07.2004
DK21.10.2004
GR21.10.2004
SE21.10.2004
ES01.11.2004
Former [2005/24]FI21.07.2004
IE21.07.2004
DK21.10.2004
GR21.10.2004
SE21.10.2004
ES01.11.2004
Former [2005/23]FI21.07.2004
DK21.10.2004
GR21.10.2004
SE21.10.2004
ES01.11.2004
Former [2005/22]FI21.07.2004
DK21.10.2004
GR21.10.2004
SE21.10.2004
Former [2005/18]FI21.07.2004
GR21.10.2004
SE21.10.2004
Former [2005/11]FI21.07.2004
SE21.10.2004
Former [2005/10]SE21.10.2004
Documents cited:Search[YD]DE19530039  (KBA PLANETA AG [DE]) [YD] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [Y]EP0883279  (BAYER AG [US]) [Y] 1-5 * siehe Zusammenfassung; column 9, line 44 - column 12, line 18; figures 5A-7B; claims 1,32,33 *;
 [Y]DE3835266  (POLYGRAPH LEIPZIG [DD]) [Y] 4 * siehe Zusammenfassung; column 2, line 6 - column 3, line 19; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]EP0405166  (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE4217813  (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *