Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1096308

EP1096308 - Exposure control device for camera [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.04.2006
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.04.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 24.05.2006  [2006/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD.
No. 210, Nakanuma
Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/18]For all designated states
FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD.
No. 210, Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi
Kanagawa-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Noguchi, Osamu
Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., No. 210 Nakanuma
Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa / JP
02 / Yokoo, Hirokazu
Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., No. 210 Nakanuma
Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa / JP
03 / Imamura, Takashi
Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., No. 210 Nakanuma
Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa / JP
04 / Mikami, Yuji
Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., No. 210 Nakanuma
Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa / JP
 [2001/18]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/18]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date00123882.302.11.2000
[2001/18]
Priority number, dateJP1999031135401.11.1999         Original published format: JP 31135499
JP1999031135301.11.1999         Original published format: JP 31135399
JP1999031299602.11.1999         Original published format: JP 31299699
JP1999031330904.11.1999         Original published format: JP 31330999
JP1999032770518.11.1999         Original published format: JP 32770599
[2001/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1096308
Date:02.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1096308
Date:01.06.2005
Language:EN
[2005/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.02.2001
ClassificationInternational:G03B7/10, G03B7/085, G03B9/02
[2001/18]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2002/04]
Former [2001/18]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Belichtungssteuerung für eine Kamera[2001/18]
English:Exposure control device for camera[2001/18]
French:Dispositif de réglage d'exposition pour appareil photographique[2001/18]
Examination procedure17.07.2001Examination requested  [2001/37]
05.11.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
28.02.2002Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR
03.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.12.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.03.2005Fee for grant paid
30.03.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP04018966.4  / EP1475657
EP04018977.1  / EP1475658
EP04018978.9  / EP1475659
EP04018979.7  / EP1475660
Opposition(s)02.03.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
28.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
26.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
12.12.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
12.12.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
12.12.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
12.12.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
12.12.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
12.12.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
12.12.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
12.12.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
12.12.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
12.12.2001IT   M01   Not yet paid
12.12.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
12.12.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
12.12.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
12.12.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
12.12.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
12.12.2001TR   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[DA]US5634163  (KAMATA KAZUO [JP]) [DA] 1-27 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]US4758859  (UEMATSU KIMIO [JP], et al) [A] 1-27 * abstract *;
 [A]US4681417  (FUJINO MASAHISA [JP], et al) [A] 1,12 * figures 1,2; claims 1,2 *;
 [A]US4125848  (ITO TADASHI, et al) [A] 1,12 * figures 1,2; claim 1 *