Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1096616

EP1096616 - Connector and connector assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.10.2003
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.10.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.12.2003  [2003/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
OSRAM SYLVANIA INC.
100 Endicott Street
Danvers, MA 01923 / US
[2001/18]
Inventor(s)01 / Miller, Timothey J.
808 Hillcrest Drive
Warren, Pennsylvania 16365 / US
02 / Golab, Randolph S.
1885 Jackson Run Road
Warren, Pennsylvania 16365 / US
03 / Hoff, Matthew J.
52S. Everertt Avenue
Jamestown, New York 14701 / US
04 / Roche, Michael J.
3125 Smith Street
Dearborn, Michigan 48124 / US
 [2001/18]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/18]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date00123890.602.11.2000
[2001/18]
Priority number, dateUS1999043087601.11.1999         Original published format: US 430876
[2001/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1096616
Date:02.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1096616
Date:19.06.2002
[2002/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.05.2002
ClassificationInternational:H01R13/629, H01R13/627
[2002/25]
Former International [2001/18]H01R13/629
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2003/11]
Former [2001/18]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verbinderanordnung[2001/18]
English:Connector and connector assembly[2001/18]
French:Dispositif de connecteurs[2001/18]
Examination procedure20.12.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/49]
20.06.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2003/49]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
26.02.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
26.02.2003DE   M01   Not yet paid
26.02.2003FR   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
26.02.2003M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200203   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5928038  (BERG PAUL CHRISTOPHER [US], et al) [X] 1,11 * column 5, line 37 - column 6, line 9; figures 1,5-7 * [Y] 2-8,12-18;
 [YA]US5174786  (KATO TETSUO [JP], et al) [Y] 2-8,12-18 * column 3, line 25 - line 68; figures 1A-1F * [A] 1,11