EP1107441 - Electrically commutated DC-motor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.10.2011 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.11.2011 [2011/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ebm-papst St. Georgen GmbH & Co. KG Hermann-Papst-Strasse 1 78112 St. Georgen / DE | [2010/33] |
Former [2001/24] | For all designated states Papst-Motoren GmbH & Co. KG Hermann-Papst-Strasse 1 78112 St. Georgen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmider, Fritz Schlossstrasse 5d 78132 Hornberg / DE | 02 /
Lukenich, Stefan Im Briel 10 78269 Volkertshausen / DE | [2010/33] |
Former [2001/24] | 01 /
Schmider, Fritz Schlossstrasse 5d 78132 Hornberg / DE | ||
02 /
Lukenich, Stefan Erlenstrasse 11 78224 Singen / DE | Representative(s) | Raible, Hans Schoderstrasse 10 70192 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/24] | Raible, Hans, Dipl.-Ing. Schoderstrasse 10 70192 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 00123898.9 | 03.11.2000 | [2001/24] | Priority number, date | DE1999221161U | 01.12.1999 Original published format: DE 29921161 U | [2001/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1107441 | Date: | 13.06.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1107441 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | [2002/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H02P1/46, H02P6/00, H02P6/22 | [2002/39] | CPC: |
H02P6/22 (EP,US);
H02K5/225 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/24] | H02P1/46, H02P6/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2003/24] |
Former [2001/24] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Elektronisch kommutierter Gleichstrommotor | [2010/27] | English: | Electrically commutated DC-motor | [2001/24] | French: | Moteur à courant continu à commutation électronique | [2010/27] |
Former [2001/24] | Elektronisch kommunierter Gleichstrommotor | ||
Former [2001/24] | Moteur à courant continu à communication électronique | Examination procedure | 10.10.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.10.2002 | Examination requested [2002/50] | 26.03.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.07.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 22.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/47] | 07.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/47] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.08.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.05.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2010 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH01255496 ; | [A]JPH05236792 ; | [A]JPS62290382 ; | [A]JPS62285686 ; | [A]DE3209394 (SCHICK GEORG DENTAL GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 9, paragraph 3 - page 11, paragraph 1; figure 1 *; | [X]DE4438569 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,12,13 * abstract * * column 2, line 40 - column 4, line 24; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE19518991 (PAPST MOTOREN GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 3-7 * column 6, line 51 - column 9, line 23; figures 1,3-6 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900111), vol. 14, no. 12, Database accession no. (E - 871), & JP01255496 A 19891012 (MATSUSHITA ELELCTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1,2 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931220), vol. 17, no. 698, Database accession no. (E - 1481), & JP05236792 A 19930910 (NIPPON DENSAN CORP) [A] 1,2 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880531), vol. 12, no. 187, Database accession no. (E - 615), & JP62290382 A 19871217 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1,2 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880525), vol. 12, no. 177, Database accession no. (E - 613), & JP62285686 A 19871211 (SONY CORP) [A] 1,2 * abstract * | by applicant | US4156168 | EP0908630 |