blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1101452 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1101452



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 103
26.10.2007 Closing of application Search / examination 1
13.07.2007 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) Search / examination 1
03.05.2007 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
03.05.2007 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
03.05.2007 Text intended for grant Search / examination 18
07.02.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
04.01.2007 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
09.10.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
09.10.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.04.2006 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
10.04.2006 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
03.04.2006 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
03.03.2006 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
15.02.2006 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 1
03.01.2006 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
29.12.2005 Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them Search / examination 2
29.12.2005 Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them Search / examination 2
12.12.2005 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 1
15.09.2005 Invitation to give notice of appointment of a professional representative and to file an authorisation Search / examination 1
17.08.2005 Request for change of representative Search / examination 1
14.10.2004 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
20.08.2001 Correction to A-publication Search / examination 1
21.07.2001 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
28.06.2001 Request for correction of the publication Search / examination 1
29.05.2001 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
11.04.2001 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
03.03.2001 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
03.03.2001 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
02.03.2001 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
02.03.2001 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
02.03.2001 European search report Search / examination 1
06.02.2001 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
15.01.2001 Invitation to pay claims fees Search / examination 1
19.12.2000 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
19.12.2000 Priority document Search / examination 10
19.12.2000 Priority document Search / examination 5
15.12.2000 Deficiency in designation of inventor Search / examination 1
03.11.2000 Abstract Search / examination 1
03.11.2000 Claims Search / examination 2
03.11.2000 Description Search / examination 12
03.11.2000 Drawings Search / examination 5
03.11.2000 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7