blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1101452


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
02.11.2007 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  05.12.2007  [2007/49]
07.07.2007 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
26.04.2007 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
13.02.2007 New entry: Reply to examination report
30.12.2006 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
24.11.2006 First examination report
23.11.2006 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
02.06.2006 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee
02.06.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.03.2006 Change - applicant published on  19.04.2006  [2006/16]
29.12.2005 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
23.12.2005 Change - applicant published on  08.02.2006  [2006/06]
09.09.2005 Change - representative published on  26.10.2005  [2005/43]
07.12.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.12.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.12.2002 Renewal fee
23.04.2002 Change - extension states
04.01.2002 Definitive list of designations published on  20.02.2002  [2002/08]
03.08.2001 Request for examination filed published on  19.09.2001 [2001/38]
02.08.2001 Change - extension states
28.07.2001 Change - name/address published on  12.09.2001 [2001/37]
06.04.2001 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  23.05.2001 [2001/21]