blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1101452
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE20010403U 25.10.2001U1
Priority number Date
DE20010403 15.06.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE29920226U 29.03.2001U1
Priority number Date
DE29920226 17.11.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2001178744Global Dossier 03.07.2001A
Priority number Date
DE20010403 15.06.2000
DE29920226 17.11.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP1101452Global Dossier 23.05.2001A1
Priority number Date
DE20010403 15.06.2000
DE29920226 17.11.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TW481979U 01.04.2002U
Priority number Date
DE20010403 15.06.2000
DE29920226 17.11.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6398550 04.06.2002B1
Priority number Date
DE20010403 15.06.2000
DE29920226 17.11.1999