blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP1101452

Designated contracting statesAT 
BE 
CH 
CY 
DE 
DK 
ES 
FI 
FR 
GB 
GR 
IE 
IT 
LI 
LU 
MC 
NL 
PT 
SE 
TR 
Examination procedure13.07.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2007/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
29.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
25.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
24.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200506   M06   Fee paid on   24.05.2006
30.11.200607   M06   Not yet paid
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:23.05.2001 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR
 
Event date:23.05.2001 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:12.09.2001 
Event description:APPLICANT DATA CHANGED
Owner Name:DIFUSIO DENTAL KERA
 
Event date:19.09.2001 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20010724
 
Event date:20.02.2002 
Event description:DESIGNATION FEES PAID
Free Format Text:AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR
 
Event date:20.02.2002 
Event description:PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES
Free Format Text:RO PAYMENT 20010724
 
Event date:08.02.2006 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:DIFUSIO DENTAL KERA
 
Event date:19.04.2006 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:KIEFER, INGE H.
 
Event date:27.12.2006 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20061009
 
Event date:05.12.2007 
Event description:APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN
Effective DATE:20070601