Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1101452

EP1101452 - Dental impression tray [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.11.2007
Database last updated on 23.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.11.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.12.2007  [2007/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kiefer, Inge H.
Waldstrasse 14
66763 Dillingen / DE
[2006/16]
Former [2006/06]For all designated states
Difusio Dental Kera
Avda Dr Mitjavila Nr. 25-local 2
Andorra La Vella / AD
Former [2001/37]For all designated states
Difusio Dental Kera
Avda Dr Mitjavila Nr. 25-local 2
Andorra La Vella / AD
Former [2001/21]For all designated states
Difusi Dental Kera
Avda Dr Mitjavila Nr. 25-local 2
Andorra La Vella / AD
Inventor(s)01 / Caritg, André
Avda Dr. Mitjavila-no.25-local 2
Andorra La Vella / ES
 [2001/21]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2005/43]
Former [2001/21]Petersen, Frank, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 11 08 47
76058 Karlsruhe / DE
Application number, filing date00123908.603.11.2000
[2001/21]
Priority number, dateDE1999220226U17.11.1999         Original published format: DE 29920226 U
DE2000210403U15.06.2000         Original published format: DE 20010403 U
[2001/21]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1101452
Date:23.05.2001
Language:DE
[2001/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.03.2001
ClassificationInternational:A61C9/00
[2001/21]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/08]
Former [2001/21]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Extension statesRO24.07.2001
TitleGerman:Zahnmedizinischer Abdrucklöffel[2001/21]
English:Dental impression tray[2001/21]
French:Plateau d'impression dentaire[2001/21]
Examination procedure24.07.2001Examination requested  [2001/38]
09.10.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.02.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.05.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.06.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/49]
13.07.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2007/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
29.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
25.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
24.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200506   M06   Fee paid on   24.05.2006
30.11.200607   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0237389  (ARNAUD, D.) [A] 1-11;
 [A]DE1766510  (LECHNER & BEK GMBH) [A] 1-11