EP1100159 - Connector latch with integrated auxiliary contacts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ITT Manufacturing Enterprises, Inc. 1105 North Market Street Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/20] | For all designated states ITT MANUFACTURING ENTERPRISES, INC. 1105 North Market Street Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mosquera, Rene Augusto 297222 Michelis Laguna Niguel, CA 92677 / US | 02 /
Betker, Jay Brian 5505 Vista Cantora Yorba Linda, CA 92887 / US | [2001/20] | Representative(s) | Esser, Wolfgang ITT Industries Regional Patent Office Europe Cannonstrasse 1 71384 Weinstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/20] | Esser, Wolfgang ITT Industries Regional Patent Office Europe Cannonstrasse 1 71384 Weinstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 00123947.4 | 03.11.2000 | [2001/20] | Priority number, date | US19990439125 | 12.11.1999 Original published format: US 439125 | [2001/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1100159 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1100159 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/627 | [2001/20] | CPC: |
H01R13/6273 (EP,US);
H01R2201/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/07] |
Former [2001/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verbinderverriegelung mit integrierten Hilfskontakten | [2001/20] | English: | Connector latch with integrated auxiliary contacts | [2001/20] | French: | Connecteur avec dispositif de verrouillage ayant contacts auxiliaires intégrés | [2003/35] |
Former [2001/20] | Connecteur avec dispositif de verrouillage ayant contact auxiliaires intégrés | Examination procedure | 16.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/03] | 16.06.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.03.2004 | BE | 03.03.2004 | CH | 03.03.2004 | CY | 03.03.2004 | FI | 03.03.2004 | FR | 03.03.2004 | IT | 03.03.2004 | LI | 03.03.2004 | NL | 03.03.2004 | TR | 03.03.2004 | DK | 03.06.2004 | GR | 03.06.2004 | SE | 03.06.2004 | DE | 04.06.2004 | ES | 14.06.2004 | PT | 03.08.2004 | GB | 03.11.2004 | IE | 03.11.2004 | LU | 03.11.2004 | MC | 30.11.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/35] | AT | 03.03.2004 | |
BE | 03.03.2004 | ||
CH | 03.03.2004 | ||
CY | 03.03.2004 | ||
FI | 03.03.2004 | ||
FR | 03.03.2004 | ||
IT | 03.03.2004 | ||
LI | 03.03.2004 | ||
NL | 03.03.2004 | ||
TR | 03.03.2004 | ||
DK | 03.06.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
DE | 04.06.2004 | ||
ES | 14.06.2004 | ||
GB | 03.11.2004 | ||
IE | 03.11.2004 | ||
LU | 03.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 03.03.2004 | |
BE | 03.03.2004 | ||
CH | 03.03.2004 | ||
CY | 03.03.2004 | ||
FI | 03.03.2004 | ||
FR | 03.03.2004 | ||
LI | 03.03.2004 | ||
NL | 03.03.2004 | ||
TR | 03.03.2004 | ||
DK | 03.06.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
DE | 04.06.2004 | ||
ES | 14.06.2004 | ||
GB | 03.11.2004 | ||
IE | 03.11.2004 | ||
LU | 03.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 03.03.2004 | |
BE | 03.03.2004 | ||
CH | 03.03.2004 | ||
FI | 03.03.2004 | ||
FR | 03.03.2004 | ||
LI | 03.03.2004 | ||
NL | 03.03.2004 | ||
TR | 03.03.2004 | ||
DK | 03.06.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
DE | 04.06.2004 | ||
ES | 14.06.2004 | ||
GB | 03.11.2004 | ||
IE | 03.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 03.03.2004 | |
BE | 03.03.2004 | ||
CH | 03.03.2004 | ||
FI | 03.03.2004 | ||
FR | 03.03.2004 | ||
LI | 03.03.2004 | ||
NL | 03.03.2004 | ||
DK | 03.06.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
DE | 04.06.2004 | ||
ES | 14.06.2004 | ||
GB | 03.11.2004 | ||
IE | 03.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 03.03.2004 | |
BE | 03.03.2004 | ||
CH | 03.03.2004 | ||
FI | 03.03.2004 | ||
LI | 03.03.2004 | ||
NL | 03.03.2004 | ||
DK | 03.06.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
DE | 04.06.2004 | ||
ES | 14.06.2004 | ||
GB | 03.11.2004 | ||
IE | 03.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/48] | AT | 03.03.2004 | |
BE | 03.03.2004 | ||
CH | 03.03.2004 | ||
FI | 03.03.2004 | ||
LI | 03.03.2004 | ||
NL | 03.03.2004 | ||
DK | 03.06.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
DE | 04.06.2004 | ||
ES | 14.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 03.03.2004 | |
BE | 03.03.2004 | ||
CH | 03.03.2004 | ||
FI | 03.03.2004 | ||
LI | 03.03.2004 | ||
NL | 03.03.2004 | ||
DK | 03.06.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
DE | 04.06.2004 | ||
ES | 14.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/14] | AT | 03.03.2004 | |
BE | 03.03.2004 | ||
CH | 03.03.2004 | ||
FI | 03.03.2004 | ||
LI | 03.03.2004 | ||
NL | 03.03.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
DE | 04.06.2004 | ||
ES | 14.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/05] | AT | 03.03.2004 | |
BE | 03.03.2004 | ||
CH | 03.03.2004 | ||
FI | 03.03.2004 | ||
LI | 03.03.2004 | ||
NL | 03.03.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
ES | 14.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | AT | 03.03.2004 | |
BE | 03.03.2004 | ||
CH | 03.03.2004 | ||
FI | 03.03.2004 | ||
LI | 03.03.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
ES | 14.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | AT | 03.03.2004 | |
CH | 03.03.2004 | ||
FI | 03.03.2004 | ||
LI | 03.03.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
ES | 14.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/44] | AT | 03.03.2004 | |
CH | 03.03.2004 | ||
FI | 03.03.2004 | ||
LI | 03.03.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/43] | AT | 03.03.2004 | |
FI | 03.03.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 03.03.2004 | |
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 03.03.2004 | |
SE | 03.06.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4029381 (TARRALL MAHONE T, et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [Y]US4030796 (PATZER MICHAEL D) [Y] 1-4,7,9,10,12 * the whole document *; | [DY]US5411402 (BETHURUM GARY C [US]) [DY] 1-4,7,9,10,12 * the whole document *; | [A]US5738532 (TAKANO YASUNARI [JP], et al) [A] 5,6,8,11* figures 4,5 * |