EP1101751 - Insensitive compressed explosive mixtures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.10.2014 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.11.2014 [2014/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Diehl BGT Defence GmbH & Co. KG Alte Nussdorfer Strasse 13 88662 Überlingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/09] | For all designated states Diehl BGT Defence GmbH & Co.KG Alte Nussdorfer Strasse 13 88662 Überlingen / DE | ||
Former [2001/21] | For all designated states Diehl Munitionssysteme GmbH & Co. KG Fischbachstrasse 16 90552 Röthenbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rudolf, Karl Georg-Hitl-Strasse 8 86529 Schrobenhausen / DE | [2001/21] | Representative(s) | Diehl Patentabteilung c/o Diehl Stiftung & Co. KG Stephanstraße 49 90478 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/30] | Diehl Patentabteilung c/o Diehl Stiftung & Co. Stephanstrasse 49 90478 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [2001/21] | Hofmann, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Patentassessor, et al Stephanstrasse 49 90478 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 00124027.4 | 04.11.2000 | [2001/21] | Priority number, date | DE19991055657 | 19.11.1999 Original published format: DE 19955657 | [2001/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1101751 | Date: | 23.05.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C06B25/04, C06B25/34 | [2001/21] | CPC: |
C06B25/04 (EP);
C06B21/0041 (EP);
C06B25/34 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [2002/08] |
Former [2001/21] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Gepresste unempfindliche Sprengstoffmischungen | [2001/21] | English: | Insensitive compressed explosive mixtures | [2001/21] | French: | Mélanges explosifs insensibles comprimés | [2001/21] | Examination procedure | 26.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/26] | 14.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/45] | 30.06.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.08.2002 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 21.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2013 | 14   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3222231 (MARKELS JR MICHAEL, et al) [A] 1 * claim - *; | [A]US4251301 (VOIGT JR H WILLIAM) [A] 1-3 * column 2, line 24 - line 66 * * column 3, line 13 - line 15; example 6 *; | [A]US4394197 (KABIK IRVING, et al) [A] 1-3 * column 2, line 18 - line 68; claim - *; | [A]US4481371 (BENZIGER THEODORE M [US]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 34 - line 55; example 1 *; | [A]US5035363 (SOMOZA CARLOS [US]) [A] 1* claim - *; | [XY]US5597974 (VORECK JR WALLACE E [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 4, line 20 - line 54; claim - * [Y] 1-3; | [Y] - J. BREMSER ET AL., "Characterization of sonochemically-animated 1,3,5-triamino-2,4,6-trinitrobenzene", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19980907), vol. 129, no. 10, Database accession no. 124495s, page 788, XP000786189 [Y] 1-3 * abstract * | [Y] - K.-Y. LEE ET AL., "Synthesis and initiation spot-size testing of sonochemically animated TATB", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19980914), vol. 129, no. 11, Database accession no. 138150n, page 813, XP000786239 [Y] 1-3 * abstract * | [ ] - Int. Annu. Conf. ICT 1998, 29th(Energetic Materials), 13.1-13.13, Fraunhofer-Institut fuer Chemische Technologie | [ ] - Int. Annu. Conf. ICT, 1998, 29th(Energetic Materials), 177.1-177.14, Fraunhofer-Institut fuer Chemische Technologie |