Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1097750

EP1097750 - Solid bowl centrifuge [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.06.2003
Database last updated on 20.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.06.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.07.2003  [2003/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Flottweg GmbH
Industriestrasse 6-8
D-84137 Vilsbiburg / DE
[2001/19]
Inventor(s)01 / Kreill, Walter
Rachelstrasse 20
84137 Vilsbiburg / DE
 [2001/19]
Application number, filing date00124041.504.11.2000
[2001/19]
Priority number, dateDE199915339606.11.1999         Original published format: DE 19953396
[2001/19]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1097750
Date:09.05.2001
Language:DE
[2001/19]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1097750
Date:27.03.2002
[2002/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.02.2002
ClassificationInternational:B04B1/20, B04B9/12, B04B11/02
[2002/13]
Former International [2001/19]B04B1/20
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2001/19]
TitleGerman:Vollmantelzentrifuge[2001/19]
English:Solid bowl centrifuge[2001/19]
French:Centrifugeuse à bol plein[2001/19]
Examination procedure15.05.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1}
26.07.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims
28.09.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/30]
03.02.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2003/30]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
07.11.2002M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200203   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US1776554  (GALE KNIGHT W) [X] 1,3 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 51 * * figure . *;
 [AD]DE3921327  (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG [DE]) [AD] 1 * abstract *