Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1079587

EP1079587 - Telephone polling method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.11.2004
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BellSouth Intellectual Property Corporation
824 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 / US
[2002/11]
Former [2001/09]For all designated states
BELLSOUTH CORPORATION
1155 Peachtree Street, N.E.
Atlanta, GA 30309-3610 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Weisser, Frank J. Jr.
11430 Donnington Drive
Duluth, Georgia 30097 / US
 [2001/40]
Former [2001/09]01 / Weisser, Frank J. Jr.
6780 Hunters Trace Circle
Atlanta, GA 30328 / US
Representative(s)Hogg, Jeffery Keith , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London
SE1 2HW / GB
[2008/35]
Former [2001/09]Hogg, Jeffery Keith , et al
Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane
London SE1 2HW / GB
Application number, filing date00124073.824.06.1997
[2001/09]
Priority number, dateUS1996067391601.07.1996         Original published format: US 673916
[2001/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1079587
Date:28.02.2001
Language:EN
[2001/09]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1079587
Date:13.03.2002
[2002/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP25.01.2002
ClassificationInternational:H04M3/42, H04Q3/00
[2001/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/09]
TitleGerman:Fernsprechabfrageverfahren[2001/09]
English:Telephone polling method[2001/09]
French:Procédé de sondage téléphonique[2001/09]
Examination procedure24.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/09]
25.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
23.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.06.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/52]
23.07.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/52]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP97931372.3  / EP0909504
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
24.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
15.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
18.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200408   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0032410  (BRUYN JACQUES DE) [Y] 1,7 * page 5, line 6 - line 19 *;
 [A]JPH0888689  ;
 [A]EP0342295  (KATZ RONALD ALAN);
 [A]US5359645  (KATZ RONALD A [US])
 [Y]  - NAOKI TAKEDA ET AL, "INITIATED TELEGONG AND TELEDOME SERVICES", NTT REVIEW, TELECOMMUNICATIONS ASSOCIATION, TOKYO, JP, (19940701), vol. 6, no. 4, pages 53 - 58, XP000460337 [Y] 1,7 * the whole document *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960830), vol. 1996, no. 08, [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - KORNBLUM K, "AUF DEM WEG ZUM INTELLIGENTEN DIENST", FUNKSCHAU, FRANZIS-VERLAG K.G. MUNCHEN, DE, (19910809), vol. 63, no. 17, ISSN 0016-2841, pages 50 - 53, XP000259564
 [A]  - SCHULZ K ET AL, "STRATEGY FOR AND IMPLEMENTATION OF THE INTELLIGENT NETWORK", INNOVATIONS IN SWITCHING TECHNOLOGY. STOCKHOLM, MAY 28 - JUNE 1, 1990, PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SWITCHING SYMPOSIUM. (ISS), NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19900528), vol. 6 SYMP. 13, pages 47 - 55, XP000130897