Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1097821

EP1097821 - Recording medium transportation apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.05.2005
Database last updated on 15.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.05.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 29.06.2005  [2005/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22, Nagaike-cho
Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi
Osaka / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/19]For all designated states
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yaneda, Takeshi
Raporu Tenri No. 821, 2613-1, Ichinomoto-cho
Tenri-shi, Nara / JP
 [2001/19]
Representative(s)Müller Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
St.-Martin-Strasse 58
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/19]MÜLLER & HOFFMANN Patentanwälte
Innere Wiener Strasse 17
81667 München / DE
Application number, filing date00124158.707.11.2000
[2001/19]
Priority number, dateJP1999031731408.11.1999         Original published format: JP 31731499
[2001/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1097821
Date:09.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/19]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1097821
Date:21.08.2002
[2002/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1097821
Date:07.07.2004
Language:EN
[2004/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:B41J13/08, B41J11/00, B65H5/22
[2002/34]
Former International [2001/19]B41J13/08
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2003/20]
Former [2001/19]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Transportvorrichtung für Aufzeichnungsmedium[2001/19]
English:Recording medium transportation apparatus[2001/19]
French:Appareil de transport pour un support d'enregistrement[2001/19]
Examination procedure14.01.2003Examination requested  [2003/12]
13.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
15.12.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.01.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.04.2004Fee for grant paid
14.04.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.04.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
26.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]US4952950  (BIBL ANDREAS [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 43 - column 3, line 4 * * column 5, line 51 - column 6, line 16; figure 3 *;
 [A]US5423255  (MAASS BURKHARD [DE]) [A] 1-10 * column 5, lines 12-28 *;
 [A]JPS5931973  ;
 [A]JPH0396320
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840615), vol. 008, no. 129, Database accession no. (P - 280), [A] 1-10 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910712), vol. 015, no. 276, Database accession no. (M - 1135), [A] 1-10 * abstract *