Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1103779

EP1103779 - Method for correcting a target related ballistic trajectory [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.12.2004
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.01.2008  [2008/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Diehl Munitionssysteme GmbH & Co. KG
Fischbachstrasse 16
90552 Röthenbach / DE
[2001/22]
Inventor(s)01 / Kautzsch, Karl
Karl-Plesch-Strasse 54
90596 Schwanstetten / DE
02 / Leininger, Jürgen
Konrad-Luber-Strasse 1
91217 Hersbruck / DE
03 / Wittmann, Jürgen
Bärenschanzstrasse 93
90429 Nürnberg / DE
04 / Reindler, Albrecht
Nessenmühlstrasse 1
91207 Lauf / DE
 [2001/22]
Representative(s)Diehl Patentabteilung
c/o Diehl Stiftung & Co. KG Stephanstrasse 49
90478 Nürnberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/30]Diehl Patentabteilung
c/o Diehl Stiftung & Co. Stephanstrasse 49
90478 Nürnberg / DE
Former [2001/22]Hofmann, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Patentassessor , et al
Stephanstrasse 49
90478 Nürnberg / DE
Application number, filing date00124171.008.11.2000
[2001/22]
Priority number, dateDE199915736329.11.1999         Original published format: DE 19957363
[2001/22]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1103779
Date:30.05.2001
Language:DE
[2001/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1103779
Date:04.02.2004
Language:DE
[2004/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.03.2001
ClassificationInternational:F41G7/34
[2001/22]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/08]
Former [2001/22]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur zielbezogenen Korrektur einer ballistischen Flugbahn[2001/22]
English:Method for correcting a target related ballistic trajectory[2001/22]
French:Procédé de correction d'une trajectoire ballistique liée à une cible[2001/22]
Examination procedure26.04.2001Examination requested  [2001/26]
13.06.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.10.2003Fee for grant paid
01.10.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.11.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
26.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY04.02.2004
ES04.02.2004
FI04.02.2004
IE04.02.2004
NL04.02.2004
TR04.02.2004
DK04.05.2004
GR04.05.2004
PT04.07.2004
[2008/03]
Former [2007/08]CY04.02.2004
ES04.02.2004
FI04.02.2004
IE04.02.2004
NL04.02.2004
TR04.02.2004
DK04.05.2004
GR04.05.2004
Former [2006/51]FI04.02.2004
IE04.02.2004
NL04.02.2004
TR04.02.2004
DK04.05.2004
GR04.05.2004
Former [2006/12]FI04.02.2004
IE04.02.2004
NL04.02.2004
DK04.05.2004
GR04.05.2004
Former [2005/03]FI04.02.2004
IE04.02.2004
DK04.05.2004
GR04.05.2004
Former [2005/02]FI04.02.2004
DK04.05.2004
GR04.05.2004
Former [2004/41]FI04.02.2004
GR04.05.2004
Former [2004/40]FI04.02.2004
Documents cited:Search[XA]DE19740888  (RHEINMETALL W & M GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 1, line 67 - column 3, line 20; figures 1-5 * [A] 2-4;
 [A]DE19718947  (RHEINMETALL W & M GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 14 *;
 [DA]WO9801719  (SECR DEFENCE [GB], et al);
 [DA]US4655411  (FRANZEN ARNE [SE], et al);
 [DA]EP0519315  (DIEHL GMBH & CO [DE]);
 [DA]US4726543  (STESSEN LOTHAR [DE]);
 [DA]EP0840393  (DIEHL GMBH & CO [DE])
by applicantWO9801719
 EP0138942
 DE4120367
 DE3608109
 EP0840393