Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1101427

EP1101427 - Device for providing and displaying foam sugar products [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.10.2003
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.10.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.12.2003  [2003/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mühleisen, Paul
Lindenstrasse 26
67166 Otterstadt / DE
[2001/21]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2001/21]
Representative(s)Zellentin, Wiger , et al
Patentanwälte Zellentin & Partner Rubensstrasse 30
67061 Ludwigshafen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/21]Zellentin, Wiger, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Zellentin & Partner Rubensstrasse 30
67061 Ludwigshafen / DE
Application number, filing date00124182.708.11.2000
[2001/21]
Priority number, dateDE199915515817.11.1999         Original published format: DE 19955158
[2001/21]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1101427
Date:23.05.2001
Language:DE
[2001/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.03.2001
ClassificationInternational:A47F3/04
[2001/21]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/08]
Former [2001/21]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Bevorratung und Darbietung von Schaumzuckerprodukten[2001/21]
English:Device for providing and displaying foam sugar products[2001/21]
French:Dispositif de distribution et présentation de produits de confiserie spongieux[2001/21]
Examination procedure28.04.2001Examination requested  [2001/26]
03.06.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/50]
07.07.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/50]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200203   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[YA]GB2162357  (FERRERO SPA [IT]) [Y] 1-5,7-9 * abstract * * page 1, line 95 - line 98 * [A] 6,10;
 [Y]DE4122522  (RUEB GUENTER [DE], et al) [Y] 1-5,7-9 * the whole document *;
 [Y]EP0835623  (HERTEL GUENTHER [DE]) [Y] 4,5 * column 4, line 47 - column 5, line 10; figure 1 *;
 [A]US5718124  (SENECAL LISE [CA]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *;
 [A]US5782094  (FREEMAN PAMELA R [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *
by applicantDE29620181U
 DE29903219U
 DE3720902
 DE4122522