Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1099963

EP1099963 - Optical element [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.10.2004
Database last updated on 26.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.10.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 24.11.2004  [2004/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nippon Sheet Glass Co., Ltd.
5-11, Dosho-machi 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/20]For all designated states
Nippon Sheet Glass Co., Ltd.
5-11, Dosho-machi 3-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Koyama, Tadashi, c/o Nippon Sheet Glass Co.Ltd.
5-11,Dosho-machi 3-chome,Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP
02 / Yamamoto, Hiroaki, c/o Nippon Sheet Glass Co.Ltd.
5-11,Dosho-machi 3-chome,Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP
03 / Nakamura, Koichiro, c/o Nippon Sheet Glass Co.Ltd.
5-11,Dosho-machi 3-chome,Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP
04 / Yamaguchi, Jun, c/o Nippon Sheet Glass Co.Ltd.
5-11,Dosho-machi 3-chome,Chuo-ku
Oasaka-shi, Osaka / JP
 [2001/20]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/20]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date00124270.013.11.2000
[2001/20]
Priority number, dateJP1999032105711.11.1999         Original published format: JP 32105799
JP2000003083708.02.2000         Original published format: JP 2000030837
[2001/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1099963
Date:16.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/20]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1099963
Date:21.08.2002
[2002/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:G02B5/18, G02B1/00
[2002/34]
Former International [2001/20]G02B5/18
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2003/20]
Former [2001/20]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Optisches Element[2001/20]
English:Optical element[2001/20]
French:Elément optique[2001/20]
Examination procedure18.11.2002Examination requested  [2003/03]
21.02.2003Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
14.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.06.2003Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) IT
17.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.01.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.05.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/48]
22.06.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
26.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
28.03.2003IT   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]DE4130550  (INST NEUE MAT GEMEIN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-17 * column 1, line 3 - column 3, line 27; example 6; claims 1-3 * * column 6, line 21 - column 6, line 23 *;
 [X]EP0287093  (HOECHST CELANESE CORP [US]) [X] 1-6,9-13,15-17 * page 1, line 30 - page 1, line 35; examples 1,3 * * page 4, line 24 - page 4, line 30 *;
 [X]JPH0486668  ;
 [X]JPH10221719  ;
 [X]JPS6289936  ;
 [PX]US6055349  (SEINO MINORU [JP], et al) [PX] 1,2 * abstract * * column 7, line 52 - column 8, line 3 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920708), vol. 016, no. 309, Database accession no. (P - 1382), [X] 1,2 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981130), vol. 1998, no. 13, [X] 1,9 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870926), vol. 011, no. 298, Database accession no. (P - 620), [X] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - FRIBERG S E ET AL, "A POLY(METHYL METHACRYLATE)/SILICA COMBINATION MATERIAL", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS SCIENCE LETTERS, CHAPMAN AND HALL LTD. LONDON, GB, (199210), vol. 20, no. 11, ISSN 0261-8028, pages 1373 - 1374, XP001068843 [A] 1,3-7,9-13,15,16 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00729366