Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1110891

EP1110891 - Machine for processing flat printed materials [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.02.2004
Database last updated on 22.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.02.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 24.03.2004  [2004/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft
Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60
69115 Heidelberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/26]For all designated states
Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft
Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60
69115 Heidelberg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Hieb, Christian
Waldstrasse 23
67141 Neuhofen / DE
02 / Gunschera, Frank
Birkenweg 10
69226 Nussloch / DE
 [2001/26]
Application number, filing date00124297.315.11.2000
[2001/26]
Priority number, dateDE199916188320.12.1999         Original published format: DE 19961883
[2001/26]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1110891
Date:27.06.2001
Language:DE
[2001/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1110891
Date:18.09.2002
[2002/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.08.2002
ClassificationInternational:B65H29/04
[2001/26]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2001/26]
TitleGerman:Flächige Bedruckstoffe verarbeitende Maschine[2001/26]
English:Machine for processing flat printed materials[2001/26]
French:Machine de traitement de matériaux imprimés plats[2001/26]
Examination procedure22.08.2002Examination requested  [2002/43]
09.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.07.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/13]
28.08.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200304   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[DXY]DE19513420  (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]) [DX] 1,2,5 * column 7, line 52 - line 58; figure 6 * [Y] 3;
 [Y]EP0448779  (PORTEC INC [US]) [Y] 3 * column 9, line 44 - column 10, line 27; figure 11 *;
 [A]DE3122035  (CHEMAPERM GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,2 * figures 4,5 *;
 [A]US5056773  (WEISGERBER WILLI [DE]);
 [A]EP0827922  (MANNESMANN AG [DE])