Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1104225

EP1104225 - Surface mounting component and mounted structure of surface mounting component [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.11.2007
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.11.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.01.2008  [2008/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD.
10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome
Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 617-8555 / JP
[2007/37]
Former [2007/04]For all designated states
MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD.
26-10, Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi
Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP
Former [2001/22]For all designated states
Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd.
26-10, Tenjin 2-chome
Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Oida, Toshifumi, c/o(A170)Murata Manu. Co.Ltd.
Intell. Prop. Department, 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome
Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP
02 / Ochii, Akihiro, c/o(A170)Murata Manu. Co.Ltd.
Intell. Prop. Department, 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome
Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP
03 / Okuda, Nobuyoshi, c/o(A170)Murata Manu. Co.Ltd.
Intell. Prop. Department, 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome
Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP
04 / Satou, Yoshirou, c/o(A170)Murata Manu. Co.Ltd.
Intell. Prop. Department, 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome
Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP
05 / Fujikawa, Katsuhiko, c/o(A170)Murata Manu. Co.Ltd.
Intell. Prop. Department, 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome
Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP
 [2001/22]
Representative(s)Schoppe, Fritz
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler
Patentanwälte
Postfach 246
82043 Pullach bei München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/22]Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing.
Schoppe, Zimmermann & Stöckeler Patentanwälte Postfach 71 08 67
81458 München / DE
Application number, filing date00124434.208.11.2000
[2001/22]
Priority number, dateJP1999033375425.11.1999         Original published format: JP 33375499
[2001/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1104225
Date:30.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1104225
Date:24.01.2007
Language:EN
[2007/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.03.2001
ClassificationInternational:H05K3/34, H01L23/498
[2001/22]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2002/08]
Former [2001/22]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Oberflächenmontiertes Bauteil und montierte Struktur eines oberflächenmontierten Bauteils[2001/22]
English:Surface mounting component and mounted structure of surface mounting component[2001/22]
French:Composant monté en surface et structure montée d'un composant monté en surface[2001/22]
Examination procedure08.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/22]
11.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.04.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.09.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.01.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.08.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.12.2006Fee for grant paid
06.12.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP06024551.1  / EP1755367
Opposition(s)25.10.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2008/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
24.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
28.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
26.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH09321177  ;
 [X]JPS5954247  ;
 [X]US4760948  (SPIECKER RAY G [US]) [X] 1,6,7 * abstract *;
 [X]US4417296  (SCHELHORN ROBERT L [US]) [X] 1,6,7 * abstract *;
 [X]EP0139431  (LUCAS IND PLC [GB]) [X] 1,6,7 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980331), vol. 1998, no. 04, [X] 1,5-7 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840712), vol. 008, no. 149, Database accession no. (E - 255), [X] 1,5-7 * abstract *