Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1099884

EP1099884 - Controller of toroidal continuously variable transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.06.2004
Database last updated on 13.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.06.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.07.2004  [2004/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD.
No.2 Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama city, Kanagawa / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/20]For all designated states
Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.
No.2 Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama city, Kanagawa / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Sakai, Hiromasa
C-306, Maronie-kan 47, Funakoshi-cho 6-chome
Yokosuka city, Kanagawa / JP
02 / Yamazaki, Tsutomu
9-12-503, Tsukui 2-chome
Yokosuka city, Kanagawa / JP
03 / Nishio, Motoharu
69-20, Shimonagaya 5-chome, Kounan-ku
Yokohama city, Kanagawa / JP
 [2001/20]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/20]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date00124555.409.11.2000
[2001/20]
Priority number, dateJP1999031957110.11.1999         Original published format: JP 31957199
JP2000005313329.02.2000         Original published format: JP 2000053133
[2001/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1099884
Date:16.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/20]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1099884
Date:16.04.2003
[2003/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.02.2003
ClassificationInternational:F16H61/00, F16H15/38
[2001/20]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/02]
Former [2001/20]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Steuereinrichtung eines stufenlosen Toroidgetriebes[2001/20]
English:Controller of toroidal continuously variable transmission[2001/20]
French:Dispositif de commande d'une transmission continue de vitesse du type torique[2001/20]
Examination procedure09.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/20]
04.09.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.01.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/30]
20.02.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2004/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200304   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US5823052  (NOBUMOTO HIDETOSHI [JP]) [A] 1,12 * column 4, line 6 - line 40 * * column 8, line 60 - column 9, line 65 * * column 11, line 15 - line 52 * * figures 1,2,5,8,11 *
by applicantJPH0539847
 JPH11247964