Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1100060

EP1100060 - Apparatus for providing thermal alert signal and control method thereof in skin-contact type terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.02.2005
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.02.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 06.04.2005  [2005/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
416, Maetan-dong
Paldal-gu
Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR
[N/P]
Former [2001/20]For all designated states
SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.
416, Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu
Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Jung, Chae-Sung
28-8, Chongdam-dong, Kangnam-gu
Seoul / KR
 [2001/20]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/20]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date00124559.609.11.2000
[2001/20]
Priority number, dateKR1949008729911.11.1999         Original published format: KR 4987299
[2001/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1100060
Date:16.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/20]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1100060
Date:17.04.2002
[2002/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1100060
Date:14.04.2004
Language:EN
[2004/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.03.2002
ClassificationInternational:G08B3/10
[2001/20]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2003/02]
Former [2001/20]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur thermischen Rufsignalisierung in einem Terminal des Hautkontakttypes[2001/20]
English:Apparatus for providing thermal alert signal and control method thereof in skin-contact type terminal[2001/20]
French:Dispositif et procédé d'alerte thermique dans un terminal de type à contact avec la peau[2001/20]
Examination procedure09.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/20]
16.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.01.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.10.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.02.2004Fee for grant paid
13.02.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.01.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
28.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XA]DE19749730  (BORDFELD HUBERTUS [DE]) [X] 4 * column 1, line 3 - column 1, line 42; figure 2 * [A] 1,9,12;
 [A]US4614191  (PERLER ROBERT F [US]) [A] 2,3 * abstract *;
 [A]US4585002  (KISSIN IGOR [US]) [A] 2,3,5-8,10 * column 1, line 50 - column 3, line 46; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0397043  (SCHULTE FRANZ JOSEF DIPL ING [DE]) [A] 2,3 * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 48 *;
 [A]US5628769  (SARINGER JOHN H [CA]) [A] 2,3,5-8 * column 5, line 10 - column 5, line 45; figure 3; example 60 *;
 [A]US4470263  (LEHOVEC KURT [US], et al) [A] 2,3 * column 2, line 20 - line 33; figure 2 *