Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1103710

EP1103710 - Method and apparatus for controlling a load [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.02.2007
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip09.11.2007Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT
published on 12.12.2007  [2007/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[2006/15]
Former [2001/22]For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Biester, Juergen
Bundschuhstrasse 21
71034 Boeblingen / DE
02 / Schulz, Udo
Kornblumenweg 34
71665 Vaihingen
Enz / DE
 [2001/22]
Application number, filing date00124576.010.11.2000
[2001/22]
Priority number, dateDE199915718127.11.1999         Original published format: DE 19957181
[2001/22]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1103710
Date:30.05.2001
Language:DE
[2001/22]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1103710
Date:09.04.2003
[2003/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1103710
Date:12.04.2006
Language:DE
[2006/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.02.2003
ClassificationInternational:F02D41/22, F02D41/30, F02D41/20, F02D41/12
[2003/15]
Former International [2001/22]F02D41/20, F02D41/22
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2004/01]
Former [2001/22]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Ansteuerung eines Verbrauchers[2001/22]
English:Method and apparatus for controlling a load[2001/22]
French:Méthode et dispositif pour contrôler une charge[2001/22]
Examination procedure09.10.2003Examination requested  [2003/50]
29.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.11.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.02.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.10.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.02.2006Fee for grant paid
14.02.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.01.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
01.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
30.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2007/50]
Former [2007/35]IT12.04.2006
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9507409  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [X] 1-7 * page 4, lines 10-15; figures 2,4; claims 1,6 * * page 6, lines 22-25; figures 3,4 *;
 [X]US4486703  (HENRICH ROBERT S [US]) [X] 1-4,7 * figures 1,7; claim 1 *;
 [AD]DE19701471  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [AD] 1 * column 1, lines 1-28; figure 1 *
by applicantDE19701471