Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1101939

EP1101939 - Multicylinder piston pump [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.08.2005
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.08.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.09.2005  [2005/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/21]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Krüger, Hinrich, Dr.
Kafkastrasse 40, VI.OG
81737 München / DE
02 / Taudt, Christian
Tegernheimer-Keller-Strasse
93105 Tegernheim / DE
03 / Zander, Eckbert
Nussweg 1
93105 Tegernheim / DE
 [2001/21]
Application number, filing date00124637.010.11.2000
[2001/21]
Priority number, dateDE199915577819.11.1999         Original published format: DE 19955778
[2001/21]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1101939
Date:23.05.2001
Language:DE
[2001/21]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1101939
Date:08.01.2003
[2003/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1101939
Date:06.10.2004
Language:DE
[2004/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.11.2002
ClassificationInternational:F04B1/04, F04B11/00
[2003/02]
Former International [2001/21]F04B1/04, F02M63/02
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2003/39]
Former [2001/21]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Mehrzylindrige Kolbenpumpe[2001/21]
English:Multicylinder piston pump[2001/21]
French:Pompe à piston avec plusieurs cylindres[2001/21]
Examination procedure16.06.2003Examination requested  [2003/33]
20.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.04.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.08.2004Fee for grant paid
04.08.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.07.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
17.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]US4453898  (LEKA GEORGE T [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7,8 * page 8, column 4, line 30 - page 9, column 5, line 13; figures 1,5,6; claim 1 *;
 [X]US3816029  (BOWEN J, et al) [X] 1-3,7,8 * page 7, column 8, line 62 - page 8, column 3, line 23; figures 1A,2 *;
 [X]EP0801982  (WALU APPARATETECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,7 * page 3, column 4, line 45 - page 5, column 8, line 45; figures 1-3,12 *;
 [A]FR2294343  (SIGMA HRANICE NP [CS]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]DE3113737  (SCHULZ ECKHARD) [A] 1 * abstract *