Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1099816

EP1099816 - Vehicle door handle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.06.2003
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.08.2003  [2003/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Valeo Sicurezza Abitacolo S.p.A.
Via Asti, 89
10026 Santena / IT
[2001/20]
Inventor(s)01 / Agostini, Astorre
Via della Costa, 51
10091 Alpignano / IT
 [2001/20]
Representative(s)Croonenbroek, Thomas Jakob , et al
Valeo Switches & Detection Systems (VSDS)
Service Propriété Industrielle
Rue Jules Verne
Vetraz Monthoux, B.P. 509
74106 Annemasse Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2002/26]Croonenbroek, Thomas , et al
Valeo Securité Habitacle, 42, rue Le Corbusier, Europarc
94042 Créteil Cedex / FR
Former [2001/20]Cerbaro, Elena, Dr. , et al
STUDIO TORTA S.r.l., Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date00124655.210.11.2000
[2001/20]
Priority number, dateIT1999TO0097612.11.1999         Original published format: IT TO990976
[2001/20]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1099816
Date:16.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.03.2001
ClassificationInternational:E05B65/20, E05B1/00
[2001/20]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   SE [2002/07]
Former [2001/20]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Türgriff für Kraftfahrzeug[2001/20]
English:Vehicle door handle[2001/20]
French:Poignée de porte pour véhicule[2001/20]
Examination procedure13.11.2001Examination requested  [2002/02]
29.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.02.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/33]
17.03.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XA]US2278534  (DICKASON JOHN W) [X] 1,2,6 * figure - * [A] 3-5;
 [XA]US2131033  (BARRINGTON JOHN W, et al) [X] 1 * figure - * [A] 4,6;
 [XA]US5970757  (RAMSAUER DIETER [DE]) [X] 1-3 * figure - * [A] 4,6