Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1101936

EP1101936 - Method for mounting main components in a nacelle of a windturbine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  21.12.2012
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.12.2012Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 23.01.2013  [2013/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
[2013/04]
Former [2011/23]For all designated states
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 Munich / DE
Former [2004/03]For all designated states
Bonus Energy A/S
Borupvej 16
7330 Brande / DK
Former [2001/21]For all designated states
BONUS ENERGY A/S
Fabriksvej 4
7330 Brande / DK
Inventor(s)01 / Nickelsen, Peter
Roeddinglundvej 3
7480 Vildbjerg / DK
 [2001/21]
Representative(s)Böckhorst, Markus , et al
Siemens AG
Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/23]Böckhorst, Markus , et al
Siemens AG CT IP Postfach 22 16 34
D-80506 München / DE
Former [2001/21]Nielsen, Leif , et al
Patrade A/S Aaboulevarden 21
8000 Aarhus C / DK
Application number, filing date00125115.617.11.2000
[2001/21]
Priority number, dateDK1916000549917.11.1999         Original published format: DK 165499
[2001/21]
Filing languageDA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1101936
Date:23.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/21]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1101936
Date:09.01.2002
[2002/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1101936
Date:23.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/26]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1101936
Date:23.01.2013
Language:EN
[2013/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.11.2001
ClassificationInternational:F03D11/04, F03D1/06, F03D1/00
[2011/49]
Former International [2001/21]F03D11/04, F03D1/06
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2001/21]
TitleGerman:Methode zum Montieren der Komponenten einer Windkraftanlage[2001/21]
English:Method for mounting main components in a nacelle of a windturbine[2001/21]
French:Méthode d'assemblage des composants d'une éolienne[2001/21]
Examination procedure27.07.2001Request for accelerated examination filed
01.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/36]
01.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.10.2002Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
05.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.12.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.04.2004Fee for grant paid
23.04.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  22.03.2005  31.03.2005  ADMISSIBLE
Vestas Wind Systems A/S
Smed Soerensens Vej 5
6950 Ringkoebing / DK
Opponent's representative
Frederiksen, Jakob Pade
Inspicos P/S
Kogle Allé 2
2970 Hørsholm / DK
 [N/P]
Former [2009/23]
Opponent(s)01  22.03.2005  31.03.2005  ADMISSIBLE
Vestas Wind Systems A/S
Smed Soerensens Vej 5
6950 Ringkoebing / DK
Opponent's representative
Frederiksen, Jakob Pade
Inspicos A/S Kogle Allé 2 P.O. Box 45
2970 Hørsholm / DK
Former [2005/20]
Opponent(s)01  22.03.2005  31.03.2005  ADMISSIBLE
Vestas Wind Systems A/S
Smed Soerensens Vej 5
6950 Ringkoebing / DK
Opponent's representative
Schmidt, Jens Joergen, et al
Patentgruppen ApS, Arosgaarden, Aaboulevarden 31
8000 Aarhus C / DK
27.04.2005Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
04.01.2006Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
27.10.2011Date of oral proceedings
16.12.2011Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
16.12.2011Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
04.04.2012Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
15.11.2012Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
10.12.2012Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition16.02.2012Appeal received No.  T0549/12
04.04.2012Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
26.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT23.06.2004
BE23.06.2004
CH23.06.2004
CY23.06.2004
FI23.06.2004
IT23.06.2004
LI23.06.2004
TR23.06.2004
DK23.09.2004
GR23.09.2004
SE23.09.2004
IE17.11.2004
LU17.11.2004
PT23.11.2004
MC30.11.2004
[2008/03]
Former [2007/35]AT23.06.2004
BE23.06.2004
CH23.06.2004
CY23.06.2004
FI23.06.2004
IT23.06.2004
LI23.06.2004
TR23.06.2004
DK23.09.2004
GR23.09.2004
SE23.09.2004
IE17.11.2004
LU17.11.2004
MC30.11.2004
Former [2007/08]AT23.06.2004
BE23.06.2004
CH23.06.2004
CY23.06.2004
FI23.06.2004
LI23.06.2004
TR23.06.2004
DK23.09.2004
GR23.09.2004
SE23.09.2004
IE17.11.2004
LU17.11.2004
MC30.11.2004
Former [2006/51]AT23.06.2004
BE23.06.2004
CH23.06.2004
FI23.06.2004
LI23.06.2004
TR23.06.2004
DK23.09.2004
GR23.09.2004
SE23.09.2004
IE17.11.2004
MC30.11.2004
Former [2006/25]AT23.06.2004
BE23.06.2004
CH23.06.2004
FI23.06.2004
LI23.06.2004
DK23.09.2004
GR23.09.2004
SE23.09.2004
IE17.11.2004
MC30.11.2004
Former [2005/48]AT23.06.2004
BE23.06.2004
CH23.06.2004
FI23.06.2004
LI23.06.2004
DK23.09.2004
GR23.09.2004
SE23.09.2004
MC30.11.2004
Former [2005/22]AT23.06.2004
BE23.06.2004
CH23.06.2004
FI23.06.2004
LI23.06.2004
DK23.09.2004
GR23.09.2004
SE23.09.2004
Former [2005/14]AT23.06.2004
BE23.06.2004
CH23.06.2004
FI23.06.2004
LI23.06.2004
GR23.09.2004
SE23.09.2004
Former [2005/11]AT23.06.2004
CH23.06.2004
FI23.06.2004
LI23.06.2004
GR23.09.2004
SE23.09.2004
Former [2005/06]CH23.06.2004
FI23.06.2004
LI23.06.2004
GR23.09.2004
SE23.09.2004
Former [2005/02]CH23.06.2004
FI23.06.2004
LI23.06.2004
SE23.09.2004
Former [2004/52]CH23.06.2004
LI23.06.2004
SE23.09.2004
Former [2004/51]CH23.06.2004
LI23.06.2004
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO9610130  (HEHENBERGER GERALD [AT]) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * [Y] 3-11;
 [A]WO9721621  (TYMON CORP LIMITED [IE], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *
 [XY]  - "Cutaway model AN BONUS 2 MW", AN WINDENERGIE GMBH WEBSITE, URL: http://www.anwind.de/2MWae.htm, (20011107), XP002182264 [X] 1,2 * Figure location: http://www.anwind.de/images/2MWQuerschnitte.gif;; figure . * [Y] 3-11
    [] - "References 2 MW", AN WINDENERGIE GMBH WEBSITE, URL: http://www.anwind.de/2%20MWe.htm, (20011107), [ ] * paragraph [0001] *
OppositionEP1101934
    - J.R.C.ARMSTRONG ET AL., "Technology develpment for, and preformance of, the WEG 25m turbine", WIND ENERGY CONVERSION 1985. FRONT PAGE, pages 279 - 283,
    - P.B.SIMPSON ET AL., "The 3MW Orkney Wind Turbine.", WIND ENERGY CONVERSION 1983. FRONT PAGE, pages 253 - 273,
    - P.B. SIMPSON ET AL., "Construction of the LS1, 3MW Wind Turbine", EUROPEAN WIND ENERGY ASSOCIATION, CONFERENCE AND EXHIBITION 1986. FRONT PAGE., EWEC 1986, pages 581 - 590,
    - P.B.SIMPSON ET AL., "Component system testing and installation of the LS1, 3MW wind turbine on Orkney", WINF ENERGY CONVERSION 1987. FRONT PAGE, pages 323 - 332,
    - DEFU, "Teknisk beskrivelse af Nibe møllerne.", RAPPORT NR : EEV 81-02, 1981, FRONT PAGE, pages 93 - 103,
    - STAFFAN ENGSTRÖM ET AL., "Evaluation of the Nordic 1000 prototype", EWEC, 1997, FRONT PAGE, pages 213 - 216,
    - T.K.PEDERSEN, "Offshore wind power - the operational aspects.", BWEA, 2-4 SEPTEMBER 1998. FRONT PAGE, pages 277 - 283,
    - NORDTANK ENERGY GROUP, "Report - Tecnical Description of the NKT1500/60-60, vers.B", (19971022), pages 19 - 21,
    - KIM DYRE ET AL., "Vindeby Off-Shore wind farm - the first experiences", EWEA 1992, FRONT PAGE, DENMARK, (19921108), pages B7 - B7-10,
    - A.L.BURTON., "Report on the Offshore Wind Energy Assessment, Phase IIB Study", EXECUTIVE SUMMERY,1985, FRONT PAGE, AND FIGS 3-4, vol. 1, pages 14 - 17,