Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1101696

EP1101696 - Outboard motor with supporting structure [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.06.2006
Database last updated on 17.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.06.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.07.2006  [2006/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Yamaha Marine Kabushiki Kaisha
1400 Nippashi-cho Hamamatsu-shi
Shizuoka-ken / JP
[N/P]
Former [2004/21]For all designated states
Yamaha Marine Kabushiki Kaisha
1400 Nippashi-cho
Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP
Former [2001/21]For all designated states
SANSHIN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1400 Nippashi-cho
Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Tsujii, Eiichiro c/o Sanshin Kogyo K.K.
1400 Nippashi-cho
Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP
 [2005/32]
Former [2001/21]01 / Tsujii, Eiichiro
Sanshin Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha, 1400 Nippashi-cho
Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/21]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date00125123.017.11.2000
[2001/21]
Priority number, dateJP1999033063419.11.1999         Original published format: JP 33063499
[2001/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1101696
Date:23.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/21]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1101696
Date:23.04.2003
[2003/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1101696
Date:10.08.2005
Language:EN
[2005/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.03.2003
ClassificationInternational:B63H20/32, B63H20/36
[2003/17]
Former International [2001/21]B63H20/32
Designated contracting statesBE,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2004/03]
Former [2001/21]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Aussenbordmotor mit Stützkonstruktion[2001/21]
English:Outboard motor with supporting structure[2001/21]
French:Moteur hors bord avec structure de support[2001/21]
Examination procedure30.06.2003Examination requested  [2003/35]
13.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.11.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
17.01.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.02.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.05.2005Fee for grant paid
31.05.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.05.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
28.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
26.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]US1802652  (IRGENS FINN T) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *;
 [XY]US5170740  (ROTTSCHAFER WILLIAM A [US]) [X] 1,3-8,10 * abstract * [Y] 9;
 [X]DE459393  (GERHARD SCHULZE PILLOT) [X] 1-4,6-8 * figure 1 *;
 [XY]US4465423  (ANDERSON MILAN B [US]) [X] 1 * abstract * [Y] 9;
 [X]US2434784  (BARDIN JESSE H) [X] 1 * figure 3 *;
 [X]US2231277  (MEPHAM ARTHUR L) [X] 1 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US5752733  (MARSHALL STEVEN R [US]) [Y] 9 * figures 11,12 *
ExaminationUS5954554