Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1103570

EP1103570 - Cement admixtures and its use [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2001/22]Copolymer for cement admixtures and its production process and use
[2013/30]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.10.2017
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.09.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
06.09.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NIPPON SHOKUBAI CO., LTD.
1-1, Koraibashi 4-chome Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0043 / JP
[2014/19]
Former [2001/22]For all designated states
Nippon Shokubai Co., Ltd.
1-1, Koraibashi 4-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0043 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yamamoto, Masaya
1-21 C-301, Shishigaya
Tsurumi-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 230-0073 / JP
02 / Uno, Toru
1-40-11 A-102, Shishigaya
Tsurumi-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 230-0073 / JP
03 / Onda, Yoshiyuki
2-61-11, Ikebukuro
Toshima-ku
Tokyo 171-0014 / JP
04 / Tanaka, Hiromichi
6-20-14, Higashitoyonaka-cho
Toyonaka-shi, Osaka 560-0003 / JP
05 / Yamashita, Akihiko
9-10-107, Takashiro-cho
Suita-shi, Osaka 564-0024 / JP
06 / Hirata, Tsuyoshi
3-4-3-619, Manabigaoka
Tarumi-ku
Kobe-shi, Hyogo 655-0004 / JP
07 / Hirano, Naoko
20-13-207, Shimoohichihigashimachi
Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo 663-8004 / JP
 [2014/19]
Former [2001/22]01 / Yamamoto, Masaya
1-21 C-301, Shishigaya, Tsurumi-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 230-0073 / JP
02 / Uno, Toru
1-40-11 A-102, Shishigaya, Tsurumi-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 230-0073 / JP
03 / Onda, Yoshiyuki
2-61-11, Ikebukuro, Toshima-ku
Tokyo 171-0014 / JP
04 / Tanaka, Hiromichi
6-20-14, Higashitoyonaka-cho
Toyonaka-shi, Osaka 560-0003 / JP
05 / Yamashita, Akihiko
9-10-107, Takashiro-cho
Suita-shi, Osaka 564-0024 / JP
06 / Hirata, Tsuyoshi
3-4-3-619, Manabigaoka, Tarumi-ku
Kobe-shi, Hyogo 655-0004 / JP
07 / Hirano, Naoko
20-13-207, Shimoohichihigashimachi
Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo 663-8004 / JP
Representative(s)Henkel & Partner mbB
Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Maximiliansplatz 21
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/19]Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Maximiliansplatz 21
80333 München / DE
Former [2001/22]Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel
Möhlstrasse 37
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date00125128.917.11.2000
[2001/22]
Priority number, dateJP1999033820529.11.1999         Original published format: JP 33820599
[2001/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1103570
Date:30.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/22]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1103570
Date:05.02.2003
[2003/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1103570
Date:07.05.2014
Language:EN
[2014/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.12.2002
ClassificationInternational:C04B24/26, C04B24/32, C08L51/00, C08L71/02, C08F216/14, C08F290/06, C08G65/26
[2013/30]
Former International [2001/22]C08F216/14, C08F290/06, C04B24/26
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   IT [2003/43]
Former [2001/22]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Zementzusammensetzungen und ihre Verwendung[2013/30]
English:Cement admixtures and its use[2013/30]
French:Compositions de ciment et leur utilisation[2013/30]
Former [2001/22]Copolymere für Zementzusammensetzungen, ihre Herstellung und Verwendung
Former [2001/22]Copolymer for cement admixtures and its production process and use
Former [2001/22]Copolymère pour compositions de ciment leur procédé de fabrication et utilisation
Examination procedure09.07.2003Examination requested  [2003/37]
20.06.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.10.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.05.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.06.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.12.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.04.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.12.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.04.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.06.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.10.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.03.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05)
16.08.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.11.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.03.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.08.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.11.2013Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
09.12.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.03.2014Fee for grant paid
27.03.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.03.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.06.2006
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  06.02.2015  16.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
COATEX
35 rue Ampère
69730 Genay / FR
Opponent's representative
Regimbeau
87 rue de Sèze
69477 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
 [2017/35]
Former [2017/02]
Opponent(s)01  06.02.2015  16.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
COATEX
35 rue Ampère
69730 Genay / FR
Opponent's representative
Balmefrezol, Ludovic Francis Pierre
Coatex SAS
35, rue Ampère
69730 Genay / FR
Former [2016/39]
Opponent(s)01  06.02.2015  16.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Coatex SAS
35, rue Ampère
Z.I. Lyon Nord
69730 Genay / FR
Opponent's representative
Balmefrezol, Ludovic Francis Pierre
Coatex SAS
35, rue Ampère
69730 Genay / FR
Former [2015/13]
Opponent(s)01  06.02.2015  16.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Coatex SAS
35, rue Ampère
Z.I. Lyon Nord
69730 Genay / FR
Opponent's representative
Fiorucci, Hélène
Coatex SAS
DPI
35 rue Ampère
69730 Genay / FR
19.03.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
25.09.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
19.09.2017Date of oral proceedings
27.10.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
27.10.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition22.12.2017Appeal received No.  T0076/18
06.03.2018Statement of grounds filed
01.04.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
27.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
29.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
29.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
29.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
29.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
27.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
30.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
30.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 12
30.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 13
18.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 14
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE07.05.2014
FR01.12.2014
[2015/51]
Former [2015/08]BE07.05.2014
Documents cited:Search[X]JPS6268806  (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * figure - *;
 [PX]WO0048961  (MBT HOLDING AG [CH], et al) [PX] 1-7,9,10 * the whole document *
ExaminationEP0850894
by applicantJPS6268806
 EP0850895