EP1103528 - Silica glass product for an optical element and method for its production [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.11.2012 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 13.02.2013 [2013/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heraeus Quarzglas GmbH & Co. KG Quarzstrasse 63450 Hanau / DE | For all designated states SHIN-ETSU QUARTZ PRODUCTS CO., LTD. 22-2, Nishi-Shinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-0023 / JP | [2012/01] |
Former [2001/22] | For all designated states Heraeus Quarzglas GmbH & Co. KG Quarzstrasse 63450 Hanau / DE | ||
For all designated states Shin-Etsu Quartz Products Co., Ltd. 22-2, Nishi-Shinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-0023 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamagata, Shigeru, Dr. Hanasaki 2-10-7 Narashino-shi, Chiba-ken 275-0013 / JP | [2001/22] | Representative(s) | Staudt, Armin Walter, et al Sandeldamm 24a 63450 Hanau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Staudt, Armin Walter, et al Patentanwalt Auf der Mauer 8 63674 Altenstadt / DE | ||
Former [2005/32] | Staudt, Armin, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwalt Auf der Mauer 8 63674 Altenstadt / DE | ||
Former [2004/35] | Staudt, Armin, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwalt Lange Strasse 10 63674 Altenstadt / DE | ||
Former [2001/22] | Staudt, Armin Walter Patentanwälte Grimm & Staudt Edith-Stein-Strasse 22 63075 Offenbach/M. / DE | Application number, filing date | 00125181.8 | 18.11.2000 | [2001/22] | Priority number, date | JP19990332853 | 24.11.1999 Original published format: JP 33285399 | [2001/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1103528 | Date: | 30.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1103528 | Date: | 31.10.2001 | [2001/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1103528 | Date: | 04.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C03C3/06, C03B19/14, C03C4/00 | [2001/44] | CPC: |
C03C3/06 (EP,KR,US);
C03B19/1453 (EP,KR,US);
C03C4/0085 (EP,KR,US);
C03B2201/07 (EP,US);
C03B2201/075 (EP,KR,US);
C03B2201/12 (EP,KR,US);
C03B2201/21 (EP,KR,US);
C03C2201/12 (EP,KR,US);
C03C2201/21 (EP,KR,US);
C03C2201/23 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2001/22] | C03B19/14, C03C3/06, C03C4/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, NL [2002/29] |
Former [2001/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Quarzglaskörper für ein optisches Bauteil und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [2001/22] | English: | Silica glass product for an optical element and method for its production | [2001/22] | French: | Corps en verre de quartz pour un élément optique et procédé de sa fabrication | [2001/22] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/05] | 14.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.06.2007 | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.01.2012 | [2013/07] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH09235134 ; | [A]JPH11302025 ; | [DA]US5326729 (YABA SUSUMU [JP], et al) [DA] 1,12,13* examples 1,2 *; | [XY]EP0691312 (NIPPON KOGAKU KK [JP]) [X] 1,2,5,6,12 * page 4, line 54 - page 5, line 31; examples 1,2; claims 1,10-15 * [Y] 13,14; | [A]EP0835848 (NIPPON KOGAKU KK [JP]) [A] 1,12,13 * claims 6,8,18 *; | [PXY]EP1043282 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1-12 * paragraphs [0059] , [0068]; examples 1-4,9,11,12,14-17,40-43,91,94; claims 16-18; tables 1,4,5,7,18-20 * [Y] 13,14; | [E]EP1094040 (HERAEUS QUARZGLAS [DE], et al) [E] 1-14 * paragraphs [0002] , [0016]; examples 1,2; claims 12,13; table 1 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980130), vol. 1998, no. 1, & JP09235134 A 19970909 (SHIN-ETSU QUARTZ PRODUCTS CO LTD) [Y] 13,14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0014] - [0017] * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000229), vol. 2000, no. 2, & JP11302025 A 19991102 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD) [A] 1,12,13 * abstract * |