blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1106397

EP1106397 - System and method for monitoring vehicle conditions affecting tires [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.09.2008
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip18.02.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 23.03.2011  [2011/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TRW Automotive U.S. LLC
12025 Tech Center Drive
Livonia, MI 48150 / US
[N/P]
Former [2007/46]For all designated states
TRW Automotive U.S. LLC
12025 Tech Center Drive
Livonia, Michigan 48150 / US
Former [2004/10]For all designated states
TRW Automotive U.S. LLC
12025 Tech Center Drive
Livonia, Michigan 48150 / US
Former [2001/24]For all designated states
TRW Inc.
One Space Park
Redondo Beach, California 90278 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Magiawala, Kiran R.
4015 W. 1037 Street, Apt. 107
Hawthorne, California 90250 / US
02 / Eberhard, Carol A.
5118 Willowwood Road
Rolling Hills Estates, California 90274 / US
03 / McIver, George W.
801 N. Paulina
Redondo Beach, California 90277 / US
04 / Dunbridge, Barry (NMI)
3614 Courtney Way
Torrance, California 90505 / US
05 / Zimmerman, Thomas A.
6909 Purpleridge Drive
Rancho Palos Verdes, California 90275 / US
 [2001/24]
Representative(s)Schmidt, Steffen J.
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/24]Schmidt, Steffen J., Dipl.-Ing.
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date00125323.629.11.2000
[2001/24]
Priority number, dateUS1999045444303.12.1999         Original published format: US 454443
[2001/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1106397
Date:13.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/24]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1106397
Date:21.01.2004
[2004/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1106397
Date:14.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.12.2003
ClassificationIPC:B60C23/04, B60C23/06, B60G17/015, G01M1/28, G01P3/44
[2004/02]
CPC:
B60C23/061 (EP,US); G01M17/02 (KR); B60C23/0408 (EP,US);
B60C23/0494 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2003/26]B60C23/04, B60C23/06
Former IPC [2001/24]B60C23/04
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2004/42]
Former [2001/24]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:System und Verfahren zur Überwachung von Fahrzeugzuständen die die Reifen beeinflussen[2001/24]
English:System and method for monitoring vehicle conditions affecting tires[2001/24]
French:Système et méthode pour surveiller les conditions d'un véhicule influençant les pneumatiques[2001/24]
Examination procedure22.06.2004Examination requested  [2004/35]
22.07.2004Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
08.11.2004Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR
29.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.10.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.05.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.09.2007Fee for grant paid
27.09.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.08.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
07.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
08.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
07.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
06.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
25.08.2004AT   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2004BE   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2004CH   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2004CY   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2004DK   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2004ES   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2004FI   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2004GR   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2004IE   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2004LU   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2004MC   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2004NL   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2004PT   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2004SE   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2004TR   M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT30.11.2007
GB14.02.2008
[2011/12]
Former [2009/29]GB14.02.2008
Documents cited:Search[X]DE2905931  (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [X] 29-32 * page 4, line 10 - line 27 * * page 6, line 1 - page 7, line 5; figure - *;
 [AY]US4574267  (JONES TREVOR O [US], et al) [A] 1-28 * column 1, line 61 - column 2, line 10 * * column 3, line 48 - line 55; figures 1-3 * [Y] 29-32;
 [A]DE3937403  (PORSCHE AG [DE]) [A] 29-36 * column 3, line 6 - line 30; figure - *;
 [X]EP0455993  (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 29,31,33-36 * page 3, line 4 - line 19 * * page 4, line 38 - page 5, line 39 * * page 7, line 52 - page 8, line 4 * * figure -; claims 2,9,10 *;
 [Y]EP0517082  (ASCOM ZELCOM AG [CH]) [Y] 37-39 * column 4, line 45 - line 58 ** column 6, line 12 - line 42; figures 1,2,5 *;
 [X]EP0636503  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-12,16-25 * page 26, line 43 - page 27, line 19; figure 1; claim 17 *;
 [X]US5557552  (NAITO TOSHIHARU [JP], et al) [X] 1-12,16-25 * column 13, line 17 - column 14, line 25; figures 24-29; claims 11,12 *;
 [AY]DE19723037  (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 13,26 * column 4, line 8 - line 26 * [Y] 29-32;
 [X]EP0873886  (CONTINENTAL AG [DE]) [X] 1-12,16-25 * page 2, line 51 - page 4, line 39; figure . *;
 [Y]DE19728419  (CONTINENTAL AG [DE]) [Y] 37-39 * column 2, line 9 - line 52; figure -; claim 8 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.