Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1207661

EP1207661 - Adaptive subcarrier loading [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.02.2013
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip30.05.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 02.07.2014  [2014/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Deutschland GmbH
Kemperplatz 1
10785 Berlin / DE
[2006/05]
Former [2005/51]For all designated states
Sony Deutschland GmbH
Hugo-Eckener-Strasse 20
50829 Köln / DE
Former [2005/40]For all designated states
SONY DEUTSCHLAND GMBH
Kemperplatz 1
10785 Berlin / DE
Former [2002/21]For all designated states
Sony International (Europe) GmbH
Kemperplatz 1
10785 Berlin / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Böhnke, Ralf, @Sony International (Europe) GmbH
Hedelfinger Strasse 61
70327 Stuttgart / DE
02 / Izumi, Seiichi, @Sony International (Europe) GmbH
Hedelfinger Strasse 61
70327 Stuttgart / DE
 [2012/16]
Former [2002/21]01 / Böhnke, Ralf, Sony International (Europe) GmbH
Hedelfinger Strasse 61
70327 Stuttgart / DE
02 / Izumi, Seiichi, Sony International (Europe) GmbH
Hedelfinger Strasse 61
70327 Stuttgart / DE
Representative(s)Keck, Stephan , et al
Witte, Weller & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Phoenixbau
Königstraße 5
70173 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/09]Keck, Stephan , et al
Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte Königstraße 5
70173 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2002/21]Rupp, Christian, Dipl.Phys.
Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date00125435.820.11.2000
[2002/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1207661
Date:22.05.2002
Language:EN
[2002/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1207661
Date:18.04.2012
Language:EN
[2012/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:H04L27/26
[2002/21]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/21]
TitleGerman:Adaptive Unterträgerbelastung[2002/21]
English:Adaptive subcarrier loading[2002/21]
French:Allocation adaptative de sous-porteuse[2002/21]
Examination procedure11.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/33]
25.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.10.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.02.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.03.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.07.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.11.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.03.2012Fee for grant paid
07.03.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP10178181.3  / EP2259479
EP10178301.7  / EP2259480
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.10.2002
Opposition(s)21.01.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
28.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
12.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
14.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
14.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
15.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
10.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
23.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
23.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 12
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT18.04.2012
BE18.04.2012
CY18.04.2012
DK18.04.2012
FI18.04.2012
SE18.04.2012
TR18.04.2012
GR19.07.2012
ES29.07.2012
PT20.08.2012
IE20.11.2012
LU20.11.2012
CH30.11.2012
FR30.11.2012
LI30.11.2012
MC30.11.2012
[2014/27]
Former [2014/21]AT18.04.2012
BE18.04.2012
CY18.04.2012
DK18.04.2012
FI18.04.2012
SE18.04.2012
TR18.04.2012
GR19.07.2012
ES29.07.2012
PT20.08.2012
IE20.11.2012
CH30.11.2012
FR30.11.2012
LI30.11.2012
MC30.11.2012
Former [2013/50]AT18.04.2012
BE18.04.2012
CY18.04.2012
DK18.04.2012
FI18.04.2012
SE18.04.2012
GR19.07.2012
ES29.07.2012
PT20.08.2012
IE20.11.2012
CH30.11.2012
FR30.11.2012
LI30.11.2012
Former [2013/47]AT18.04.2012
BE18.04.2012
CY18.04.2012
DK18.04.2012
FI18.04.2012
SE18.04.2012
GR19.07.2012
ES29.07.2012
PT20.08.2012
IE20.11.2012
CH30.11.2012
LI30.11.2012
Former [2013/33]AT18.04.2012
BE18.04.2012
CY18.04.2012
DK18.04.2012
FI18.04.2012
SE18.04.2012
GR19.07.2012
ES29.07.2012
PT20.08.2012
CH30.11.2012
LI30.11.2012
Former [2013/22]AT18.04.2012
BE18.04.2012
CY18.04.2012
DK18.04.2012
FI18.04.2012
SE18.04.2012
GR19.07.2012
ES29.07.2012
PT20.08.2012
Former [2013/08]AT18.04.2012
BE18.04.2012
CY18.04.2012
DK18.04.2012
FI18.04.2012
SE18.04.2012
GR19.07.2012
PT20.08.2012
Former [2013/07]AT18.04.2012
BE18.04.2012
CY18.04.2012
FI18.04.2012
SE18.04.2012
GR19.07.2012
PT20.08.2012
Former [2013/04]BE18.04.2012
CY18.04.2012
FI18.04.2012
SE18.04.2012
GR19.07.2012
PT20.08.2012
Former [2013/01]CY18.04.2012
FI18.04.2012
SE18.04.2012
GR19.07.2012
PT20.08.2012
Former [2012/50]CY18.04.2012
FI18.04.2012
SE18.04.2012
GR19.07.2012
Former [2012/49]CY18.04.2012
FI18.04.2012
SE18.04.2012
Former [2012/48]FI18.04.2012
SE18.04.2012
Documents cited:Search[XY]  - T.KELLER ET AL, "Adaptive Multicarrier Modulation: A Convenient Framework for Time-Frequency Processing in Wireless Communications", PROC. IEEE (USA), PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEE, new-york (us), (200005), vol. 88, no. 5, pages 611 - 640, XP002171294 [X] 1-5,7-10,12,13 * page 612, column R, line 52 - page 613, column L, line 6 * * page 627, column L, line 19 - line 24 * * page 627, column L, line 31 - column R, line 5 * * page 628, column L, line 24 - line 28 * * page 628, column R, line 16 - line 28 * * page 629, column L, line 24 - line 35 * * page 630, column L, line 10 - line 15 * * page 631, column L, line 22 - line 28 * * page 632, column L, line 11 - line 14 * [Y] 17

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/5.849157
 [XY]  - HAMAGUCHI K ET AL, "PERFORMANCE OF MULTICARRIER/QAM-LEVEL-CONTROLLED ADAPTIVE MODULATION FOR LAND MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS", IEICE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS,JP,INSTITUTE OF ELECTRONICS INFORMATION AND COMM. ENG. TOKYO, (19980401), vol. E81-B, no. 4, ISSN 0916-8516, pages 770 - 775, XP000780472 [X] 1,11,14-16 * page 770, column R, line 40 - line 43 * * page 771, column R, line 4 - line 8 * * page 772; figure 2 * * page 772, column R, line 29 - line 36 * * page 774, column L, paragraph 3.4 - column R, line 18 * [Y] 17
 [X]  - M. GIACOMO, "Analysis and comparison of different modulation methods for wireless broadband indoor link", CEFRIEL, (200006), pages 1 - 15, URL: www.cefriel.it/Ats/Research/research.asp?ID, (20010706), XP002171295 [X] 1,5,6,14 * page 8, line 23 - line 28 * * page 9, paragraph 5. - page 11, paragraph 6.; figure 7 *
 [A]  - R. GRÜNHEID ET AL, "Adaptive Modulation for the HIPERLAN/2 Air Interface", 5TH INTERNATIONAL OFDM WORKSHOP 2000, hamburg (de), (200009), pages 4-1 - 4-4, URL: www.dit.upm.es/~ist-brain/publications/fg00_final.pdf, (20010706), XP002171296