Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1103404

EP1103404 - Lubricating structure for a hybrid vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.11.2004
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.11.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 29.12.2004  [2004/53]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/22]For all designated states
HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome
Minato-ku Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Morishita, Naohisa, c/o Honda R & D Co., Ltd.
4-1, Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi, Saitama / JP
 [2001/22]
Representative(s)Liska, Horst , et al
Weickmann & Weickmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Postfach 860 820
81635 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/22]Liska, Horst, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20
81635 München / DE
Application number, filing date00125518.121.11.2000
[2001/22]
Priority number, dateJP1999033503425.11.1999         Original published format: JP 33503499
[2001/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1103404
Date:30.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1103404
Date:07.01.2004
Language:EN
[2004/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.03.2001
ClassificationInternational:B60K6/02, F01M1/12
[2001/22]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2002/08]
Former [2001/22]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Schmiereinrichtung für Hybridfahrzeug[2001/22]
English:Lubricating structure for a hybrid vehicle[2001/22]
French:Dispositif de lubrification pour vehicule hybride[2001/22]
Examination procedure16.08.2001Examination requested  [2001/42]
26.06.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.09.2003Fee for grant paid
26.09.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.10.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/53]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
31.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[PA]US6135919  (SHIMAKURA MASAKI [JP]) [PA] 1 * column 2, line 28 - column 9, line 41; figure - *;
 [A]US5823282  (YAMAGUCHI KOZO [JP]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 6 - column 17, line 54; figure - *;
 [A]EP0764799  (DOORNES TRANSMISSIE BV [NL]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 34 - column 6, line 25; figure - *;
 [A]EP0926401  (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 31 - column 12, line 38; figure - *;
 [A]EP0908343  (AISIN AW CO [JP]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 22 - column 15, line 11 *;
 [A]US5799744  (YAMAGUCHI KOZO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column A *
by applicantJPH10324177