blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1108694

EP1108694 - Method for the production of an identifiable fibre product [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2001/25]Method for the production of an identifiable mineral fibre product
[2002/40]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  05.12.2008
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2008Revocation of patentpublished on 07.01.2009  [2009/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Knauf Insulation GmbH
Industriestrasse 18
9586 Fürnitz / AT
[2008/20]
Former [2003/38]For all designated states
Heraklith AG
Industriestrasse 18
9586 Fürnitz / AT
Former [2001/25]For all designated states
Österreichische Heraklith GmbH
Industriestrasse 18
9586 Fürnitz / AT
Inventor(s)01 / Krömer, Georg
Holsteinische Strasse 27
10717 Berlin / DE
02 / Herman, Dietmar
Gmeineck Weg Nummer 3
9871 Seeboden / AT
 [2001/25]
Representative(s)Becker, Thomas, et al
Patentanwälte
Becker & Müller
Turmstrasse 22
40878 Ratingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/25]Becker, Thomas, Dr., Dipl.-Ing., et al
Patentanwälte Becker & Müller, Turmstrasse 22
40878 Ratingen / DE
Application number, filing date00125613.023.11.2000
[2001/25]
Priority number, dateDE1999106008513.12.1999         Original published format: DE 19960085
[2001/25]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1108694
Date:20.06.2001
Language:DE
[2001/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1108694
Date:16.04.2003
Language:DE
[2003/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.04.2001
ClassificationIPC:C03C25/62, C03C25/10, E04B1/78, B01J19/12, D06H1/00
[2002/40]
CPC:
G09F3/00 (EP); C03C25/10 (EP); C03C25/6208 (EP);
E04B2001/741 (EP)
Former IPC [2001/25]C03C25/62, C03C25/10, E04B1/78, B01J19/12
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/11]
Former [2001/25]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung eines identifizierbaren Faserproduktes[2002/40]
English:Method for the production of an identifiable fibre product[2002/40]
French:Méthode de production d'un produit fibreux identifiable[2002/40]
Former [2001/25]Verfahren zur Herstellung eines identifizierbaren Mineralfaserproduktes
Former [2001/25]Method for the production of an identifiable mineral fibre product
Former [2001/25]Méthode de production d'un produit de fibres en verre identifiable
Examination procedure23.06.2001Examination requested  [2001/34]
27.12.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.02.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.12.2002Fee for grant paid
13.12.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  15.01.2004  10.08.2004  ADMISSIBLE
ROCKWOOL INTERNATIONAL A/S
Hovedgaden 501
DK-2640 Hedehusene / DK
Opponent's representative
Wanischeck-Bergmann, Axel
Stenger - Watzke - Ring
Intellectual property
Am Seestern 8
40547 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  16.01.2004  10.08.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Saint-Gobain Isover G+H AG
Bgm.-Grünzweig-Str. 1
67059 Ludwigshaven / DE
Opponent's representative
Ritthaler, Wolfgang
Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner
Röss, Kaiser, Polte
Partnerschaft
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei, Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22
85354 Freising / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2008/37]
Opponent(s)01  15.01.2004  10.08.2004  ADMISSIBLE
ROCKWOOL INTERNATIONAL A/S
Hovedgaden 501
DK-2640 Hedehusene / DK
Opponent's representative
Wanischeck-Bergmann, Axel
STENGER - WATZKE - RING Intellectual Property Am Seestern 8
40547 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  16.01.2004  10.08.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Saint-Gobain Isover G+H AG
Bgm.-Grünzweig-Str. 1
67059 Ludwigshaven / DE
Opponent's representative
Ritthaler, Wolfgang
Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22
85354 Freising / DE
Former [2004/12]
Opponent(s)01  15.01.2004   
ROCKWOOL INTERNATIONAL A/S
Hovedgaden 501
DK-2640 Hedehusene / DK
Opponent's representative
Wanischeck-Bergmann, Axel, Dipl.-Ing.
Rondorfer Strasse 5a
50968 Köln / DE
 02  16.01.2004    ADMISSIBLE
Saint-Gobain Isover G+H AG
Bgm.-Grünzweig-Str. 1
67059 Ludwigshaven / DE
Opponent's representative
Ritthaler, Wolfgang, Dr.rer.nat.Dipl.-Chem.
Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22
85354 Freising / DE
11.03.2004Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
09.07.2004Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
12.04.2005Date of oral proceedings
19.05.2005Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
19.05.2005Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
08.07.2008Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
18.07.2008Legal effect of revocation of patent [2009/02]
Appeal following opposition06.07.2005Appeal received No.  T0783/05
22.09.2005Statement of grounds filed
08.07.2008Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
22.06.2005Appeal received No.  T0783/05
08.07.2008Date of oral proceedings
16.07.2008Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB16.04.2003
IE16.04.2003
IT16.04.2003
TR16.04.2003
GR16.07.2003
PT16.07.2003
ES30.10.2003
CY23.11.2003
LU23.11.2003
BE30.11.2003
MC30.11.2003
[2007/35]
Former [2007/04]GB16.04.2003
IE16.04.2003
TR16.04.2003
GR16.07.2003
PT16.07.2003
ES30.10.2003
CY23.11.2003
LU23.11.2003
BE30.11.2003
MC30.11.2003
Former [2006/51]GB16.04.2003
TR16.04.2003
GR16.07.2003
PT16.07.2003
ES30.10.2003
CY23.11.2003
LU23.11.2003
BE30.11.2003
MC30.11.2003
Former [2005/02]GB16.04.2003
GR16.07.2003
PT16.07.2003
ES30.10.2003
CY23.11.2003
LU23.11.2003
BE30.11.2003
MC30.11.2003
Former [2005/01]GB16.04.2003
GR16.07.2003
PT16.07.2003
ES30.10.2003
CY23.11.2003
LU23.11.2003
BE30.11.2003
Former [2004/39]GB16.04.2003
GR16.07.2003
PT16.07.2003
ES30.10.2003
CY23.11.2003
LU23.11.2003
Former [2004/36]GB16.04.2003
GR16.07.2003
PT16.07.2003
ES30.10.2003
CY23.11.2003
Former [2004/22]GB16.04.2003
GR16.07.2003
PT16.07.2003
ES30.10.2003
Former [2004/04]GR16.07.2003
PT16.07.2003
ES30.10.2003
Former [2004/02]GR16.07.2003
PT16.07.2003
Former [2004/01]PT16.07.2003
Documents cited:Search[A]DE19630478  (QUARZWERKE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-4 * claim - *;
 [A]DE29822362U  (PFLEIDERER DAEMMSTOFFTECHNIK [DE]) [A] 1-4 * claim - *;
 [PA]WO0045000  (SAINT GOBAIN ISOVER [FR], et al) [PA] 1-4* claim - *
by applicantDE3229601
 DE29603918U
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.