Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1119066

EP1119066 - Device for treating a medium in a reactor with a reaction section holding a catalyst [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.11.2003
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.01.2004  [2004/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ballard Power Systems AG
Neue Strasse 95
73230 Kirchheim / Teck-Nabern / DE
[2002/24]
Former [2001/30]For all designated states
XCELLSIS GmbH
Neue Strasse 95
73230 Kirchheim/Teck-Nabern / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Bachinger, Patrick
Eichenweg 1
73252 Lenningen / DE
02 / Boneberg, Stefan
Hohenneuffenstrasse 32
72660 Beuren / DE
03 / Heil, Dietmar
Jetzhöferstrasse 35
88477 Schwendi / DE
04 / Keppeler, Berthold, Dr.
Dachsweg 19
73230 Kirchheim/Teck / DE
05 / Schonert, Michael
Namurstrasse 3
70374 Stuttgart / DE
 [2001/30]
Representative(s)Beyer, Andreas , et al
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/48]Beyer, Andreas, Dr. , et al
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Former [2001/30]Kocher, Klaus-Peter Dipl.-Phys , et al
DaimlerChrysler AG, Intellectual Property Management, FTP/A-C106
70546 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date00125637.923.11.2000
[2001/30]
Priority number, dateDE200010202419.01.2000         Original published format: DE 10002024
[2001/30]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1119066
Date:25.07.2001
Language:DE
[2001/30]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1119066
Date:11.09.2002
[2002/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:H01M8/06, B01J8/06, B01J8/02, C01B3/58, B01J19/24, B01J35/06, F01N3/28
[2002/36]
Former International [2001/30]H01M8/06, B01J8/06, B01J8/02, C01B3/58
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2003/22]
Former [2001/30]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Behandlung eines Mediums in einem Reaktor mit einem katalysatorhaltigen Reaktionsraum[2001/30]
English:Device for treating a medium in a reactor with a reaction section holding a catalyst[2001/30]
French:Dispositif pour traiter une substance dans un réacteur avec une section catalytique[2001/30]
Examination procedure13.05.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/02]
22.07.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2004/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
24.04.2003M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]DE1594716  (WMF WUERTTEMBERG METALLWAREN) [X] 1,2,4,7-9 * column 3, line 11 - line 25 * * column 4, line 24 - line 32 * * column 6, line 22 - line 41 * * figures 4,5 *;
 [X]DE4125686  (OBERLAND MANGOLD GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4,7-9 * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 31 * * column 3, line 50 - column 4, line 7 * * column 4, line 17 - line 42 * * figures 1-4; claims 1-12 *;
 [X]GB2074888  (JOHNSON MATTHEY CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4,6,8,9 * page 2, line 10 - line 14 * * page 2, line 53 - page 3, line 12 * * figures 5-7; claims 1,8,14,15 *;
 [X]US5934073  (GIESHOFF JUERGEN [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,8,9 * column 4, line 20 - line 30 * * column 6, line 18 - line 62 * * figure 2 *;
 [X]  - MAYER A ET AL, "GESTRICKTE STRUKTUREN AUS ENDLOSFASERN FUR DIE ABGASREINIGUNG - TEIL 2 KNITTED STRUCTURES OF ENDLESS FIBERS FOR GAS CLEANING - PART 2", MTZ MOTORTECHNISCHE ZEITSCHRIFT, FRANCKH'SCHE VERLAGSHANDLUNG,ABTEILUNG TECHNIK. STUTTGART, DE, (19950701), vol. 56, no. 7/8, ISSN 0024-8525, pages 444 - 452, XP000517889 [X] 1,2,4,8,9 * page 444, paragraph 1 - page 448, paragraph 1 * * page 449, paragraph 2 - page 450, paragraph 4 * * figures 12-16 *