EP1103659 - Slipform machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2009 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wirtgen GmbH Reinhard-Wirtgen-Strasse 2 53578 Windhagen / DE | [2008/16] |
Former [2001/22] | For all designated states WIRTGEN GmbH Hohner Strasse 2 53578 Windhagen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Smolders, Raymond Sint Jobsstraat 87 2200 Herentals / BE | 02 /
Holger, Thieme Marienstrasse 10 53560 Kalenborn / DE | [2001/31] |
Former [2001/22] | 01 /
Smolders, Raymond Sint Jobsstraat 8 2200 Herentals / BE | ||
02 /
Holger, Thieme Marienstrasse 10 53560 Kalenborn / DE | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | Dallmeyer, Georg, et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2001/22] | Dallmeyer, Georg, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus) 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 00125724.5 | 24.11.2000 | [2001/22] | Priority number, date | DE1999157048 | 26.11.1999 Original published format: DE 19957048 | [2001/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1103659 | Date: | 30.05.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1103659 | Date: | 13.08.2003 | [2003/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1103659 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | E01C19/42, E02B3/12, B62D11/20 | [2003/33] | CPC: |
B62D11/20 (EP,US);
B62D7/02 (EP,US);
E01C19/42 (EP,US);
E01C2301/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/22] | E01C19/42, E02B3/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/22] | Title | German: | Gleitschalungsfertiger | [2001/22] | English: | Slipform machine | [2001/22] | French: | Machine à coffrage glissant | [2001/22] | Examination procedure | 16.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/09] | 01.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04105768.8 / EP1522632 | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 23.04.2008 | DK | 23.04.2008 | FI | 23.04.2008 | IE | 23.04.2008 | IT | 23.04.2008 | TR | 23.04.2008 | SE | 23.07.2008 | GR | 24.07.2008 | LU | 24.11.2008 | CH | 30.11.2008 | LI | 30.11.2008 | MC | 30.11.2008 | [2010/47] |
Former [2010/37] | CY | 23.04.2008 | |
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
IE | 23.04.2008 | ||
IT | 23.04.2008 | ||
TR | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
LU | 24.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | CY | 23.04.2008 | |
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
IE | 23.04.2008 | ||
IT | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
LU | 24.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/28] | DK | 23.04.2008 | |
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
IE | 23.04.2008 | ||
IT | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
LU | 24.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/49] | DK | 23.04.2008 | |
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
IE | 23.04.2008 | ||
IT | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/39] | DK | 23.04.2008 | |
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
IE | 23.04.2008 | ||
IT | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | DK | 23.04.2008 | |
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
IE | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | DK | 23.04.2008 | |
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
IE | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | FI | 23.04.2008 | |
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | FI | 23.04.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB942349 (RENNER CO) [X] 1 * page 2, lines 24-63; figures 1-4 * [Y] 2,10-12,15-17; | [Y]US3392797 (GIBSON CHRISTIAN D, et al) [Y] 19-23 * column 2, line 58 - column 8, line 72; figure 11 *; | [YA]US3540359 (SWISHER GEORGE W JR, et al) [Y] 10 * figures 2,3,9 * [A] 3-9; | [A]US3710695 (MILLER C, et al) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [XY]US4029165 (MILLER DAVID J, et al) [X] 18 * column 1, line 52 - column 6, line 61 * * figures 1,3,6,11-13 * [Y] 19-23; | [Y]US4789266 (CLARKE JR SAMUEL Y [US], et al) [Y] 11,12,15-17 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0893539 (CASTERS FRANCOIS [BE]) [Y] 2 * column 2, line 15 - column 7, line 7 * * figure 5 *; | [A]DE19814052 (WIRTGEN GMBH [DE]) [A] 11-15 * the whole document *; | [PA]EP1039037 (BITELLI SPA [IT]) [PA] 18-23* the whole document * | by applicant | DE19814052 |