EP1106675 - Use of partial glyceride polyglycol ethers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.12.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cognis IP Management GmbH Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/25] | For all designated states Cognis IP Management GmbH Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2002/17] | For all designated states Cognis Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2001/24] | For all designated states Cognis Deutschland GmbH Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Behler, Ansgar, Dr. Siegfriedstrasse 80 46240 Bottrop / DE | 02 /
Fabry, Bernd, Dr. Danziger Strasse 31 41352 Korschenbroich / DE | [2001/24] | Application number, filing date | 00125727.8 | 24.11.2000 | [2001/24] | Priority number, date | DE1999158398 | 03.12.1999 Original published format: DE 19958398 | [2001/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1106675 | Date: | 13.06.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1106675 | Date: | 18.09.2002 | [2002/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1106675 | Date: | 09.02.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C11D1/74 | [2001/24] | CPC: |
C11D1/72 (EP);
C11D1/721 (EP);
C11D1/74 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT [2003/23] |
Former [2001/24] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verwendung von Partialglyceridpolyglycolethern | [2001/24] | English: | Use of partial glyceride polyglycol ethers | [2001/24] | French: | Utilisation de polyglycolethers de glycerides partiels | [2001/24] | Examination procedure | 24.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/24] | 11.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 09.02.2005 | ES | 20.05.2005 | [2007/35] |
Former [2006/12] | ES | 20.05.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]EP1045021 (KAO CORP SA [ES]) [PX] 1-5 * claims 1,3,6,9-11 *; | [A]WO9800497 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US]) [A] 1-5 * page 14, lines 5-20; example -; claim 1 *; | [A]DE19824359 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [A] 1-5 * example -; claims 1,4 * |