Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1103601

EP1103601 - Method for culturing cells [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2001/22]A method for culturing cell and a culture vessel
[2007/25]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.09.2009
Database last updated on 17.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.09.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.10.2009  [2009/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Menicon Co., Ltd.
21-19, Aoi 3-chome Naka-ku Nagoya-shi
Aichi-ken / JP
[2008/47]
Former [2001/22]For all designated states
Menicon Co., Ltd.
21-19, Aoi 3-chome Naka-ku
Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yamamoto, Nobutaka, c/o Menicon Co., Ltd.
Central Research Lab., 1-10, Takamoridai 5-chome
Kasugai-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
02 / Sugiyama, Akihisa, c/o Menicon Co., Ltd.
Central Research Lab., 1-10, Takamoridai 5-chome
Kasugai-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
03 / Kawaminami, Satoshi, c/o Menicon Co., Ltd.
Central Research Lab., 1-10, Takamoridai 5-chome
Kasugai-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
 [2001/22]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/34]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Former [2001/22]Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner, Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date00125781.524.11.2000
[2001/22]
Priority number, dateJP1999033620826.11.1999         Original published format: JP 33620899
JP1999033621026.11.1999         Original published format: JP 33621099
[2001/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1103601
Date:30.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1103601
Date:19.11.2008
Language:EN
[2008/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.04.2001
ClassificationInternational:C12N5/00, C12N13/00, C12M3/00, C12M3/04
[2001/22]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2002/08]
Former [2001/22]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Kultivierung von Zellen[2007/25]
English:Method for culturing cells[2007/25]
French:Méthode de cultivation de cellules[2007/25]
Former [2001/22]Verfahren zur Kultivierung von Zellen und Kulturgefäss
Former [2001/22]A method for culturing cell and a culture vessel
Former [2001/22]Méthode de cultivation de cellules et récipient de culture
Examination procedure30.04.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.09.2001Examination requested  [2001/44]
18.09.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.10.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.02.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.12.2006Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.12.2006
07.12.2006Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
12.12.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.12.2006Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
20.04.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.07.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.11.2007Fee for grant paid
22.11.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.12.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
20.12.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
Opposition(s)20.08.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
28.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
29.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
29.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
30.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0168217  (MAKITSUBO TAKESHI) [X] 1,3,4 * claim - *;
 [A]US4016036  (GREEN HOWARD, et al) [A] 1,5-8 * claims 1-8 *