blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1106387

EP1106387 - Marking apparatus with oscillation control system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.10.2004
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip22.10.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.12.2004  [2004/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ando Electric Co., Ltd.
3-484, Tsukagoshi, Saiwai Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/24]For all designated states
Ando Electric Co., Ltd.
3-484, Tsukagoshi, Saiwai
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yano, Tetsuo, Ando Electric Co., Ltd.
3-484, Tsukagoshi, Kaiwai-ku
Kawashaki-shi, Kanagawa / JP
02 / Funahashi, Kazuyuki, Ando Electric Co., Ltd.
3-484, Tsukagoshi, Kaiwai-ku
Kawashaki-shi, Kanagawa / JP
03 / Kudoh, Tetsuya, Ando Electric Co., Ltd.
3-484, Tsukagoshi, Kaiwai-ku
Kawashaki-shi, Kanagawa / JP
 [2001/24]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/24]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date00125792.224.11.2000
[2001/24]
Priority number, dateJP1999034126030.11.1999         Original published format: JP 34126099
[2001/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1106387
Date:13.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/24]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1106387
Date:03.03.2004
[2004/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.01.2004
ClassificationIPC:B44B3/00
[2001/24]
CPC:
B44B3/005 (EP,US)
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2004/48]
Former [2001/24]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Markierungsgerät mit Oszillationsregelsystem[2001/24]
English:Marking apparatus with oscillation control system[2001/24]
French:Appareil de marquage avec système de régulation d'oscillation[2001/24]
Examination procedure02.06.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/50]
08.07.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200304   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH08318568  ;
 [A]JPH10226196  ;
 [A]EP0402754  (ANDO ELECTRIC [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970430), vol. 1997, no. 04, & JP08318568 A 19961203 (ANDO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981130), vol. 1998, no. 13, & JP10226196 A 19980825 (HONDA ELECTRON CO LTD;ANDO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.