Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1107141

EP1107141 - Method for rapidly submitting a stock, future or goods order and computer system for this purpose [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  17.11.2017
Database last updated on 15.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.11.2017Refusal of applicationpublished on 20.12.2017  [2017/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Laqua, Hannelore
Unterföhringer Strasse 4
85737 Ismaning / DE
[2014/15]
Former [2001/24]For all designated states
Wengert, Horst
Unterföhringer Strasse 4
85737 Ismaning / DE
For all designated states
Laqua, Hannelore
Unterföhringer Strasse 4
85737 Ismaning / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Wengert, Horst
Unterföhringer Strasse 4
85737 Ismaning / DE
 [2001/24]
Representative(s)von Hellfeld, Axel
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/24]von Hellfeld, Axel, Dr. Dipl.-Phys.
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date00125816.924.11.2000
[2001/24]
Priority number, dateDE199915810002.12.1999         Original published format: DE 19958100
US2000068550909.10.2000         Original published format: US 685509
[2001/24]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1107141
Date:13.06.2001
Language:DE
[2001/24]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1107141
Date:31.03.2004
[2004/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.02.2004
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/60
[2001/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2001/24]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum schnellen Abgeben einer Wertpapier-, Futureskontrakt- oder Warenorder und Computersystem zu diesem Zweck[2001/24]
English:Method for rapidly submitting a stock, future or goods order and computer system for this purpose[2001/24]
French:Méthode de délivrance rapide de commandes d'actions, délivrables à terme ou de biens, et système d'ordinateur à cet effet[2001/24]
Examination procedure29.09.2004Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.09.2004Examination requested  [2004/48]
31.01.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.03.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.10.2011Date of oral proceedings
13.04.2012Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/51]
13.04.2012Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
20.06.2017Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/51]
Appeal following examination01.06.2012Appeal received No.  T2019/12
03.08.2012Statement of grounds filed
07.01.2016Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [2016/02]
03.05.2016Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2016/19]
20.06.2017Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
20.06.2017Date of oral proceedings
30.06.2017Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  31.01.2008
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
18.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
18.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
30.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
16.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
30.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
19.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
19.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
30.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
17.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 12
19.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 13
19.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 14
28.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 15
19.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 16
18.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 17
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No Search