Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1107141 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1107141



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 460
13.11.2017 Closing of application Search / examination 2
08.11.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
06.11.2017 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 19
06.11.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
30.06.2017 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
30.06.2017 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 3
19.05.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
19.05.2017 Claims Appeal 1
19.05.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
09.03.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
07.03.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
06.03.2017 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
06.03.2017 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 3
01.03.2017 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
16.02.2017 General enquiry Appeal 1
12.01.2017 General enquiry Appeal 1
03.05.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 7
07.01.2016 F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) Appeal 4
23.12.2015 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
11.12.2015 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 1
02.12.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
26.11.2015 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
30.07.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
26.03.2015 Document concerning representation Appeal 1
06.03.2014 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 2
12.02.2014 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Appeal 1
12.02.2014 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
12.02.2014 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Appeal 1
11.02.2013 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
24.09.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
05.09.2012 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
03.08.2012 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
03.08.2012 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
03.08.2012 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
03.08.2012 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
03.08.2012 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
03.08.2012 Claims Appeal 3
03.08.2012 Claims Appeal 3
03.08.2012 Claims Appeal 3
03.08.2012 Claims Appeal 3
03.08.2012 Claims Appeal 3
03.08.2012 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 23
01.06.2012 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
29.05.2012 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
20.04.2012 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
13.04.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
13.04.2012 Annex to a communication Search / examination 6
13.04.2012 Annex to a communication Search / examination 6
13.04.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 9
13.04.2012 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
13.04.2012 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
13.04.2012 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 9
13.04.2012 Means of redress Search / examination 2
13.04.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
13.04.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
13.04.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
07.03.2012 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
12.10.2011 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
07.10.2011 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
08.09.2011 Claims Search / examination 2
08.09.2011 Claims Search / examination 2
08.09.2011 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 8
06.06.2011 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
31.05.2011 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
25.05.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
25.05.2011 Annex to a communication Search / examination 100
25.05.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 8
25.05.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
12.04.2011 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
14.03.2011 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 1
11.03.2011 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 1
17.10.2008 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
17.10.2008 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
16.10.2008 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 4
27.03.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
31.01.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
31.01.2008 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
18.01.2008 Reply to a complaint letter Search / examination 3
08.11.2007 Complaint letter by applicant Search / examination 2
29.09.2004 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
29.09.2004 Annex Search / examination 8
29.09.2004 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
05.04.2004 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
11.02.2004 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
11.02.2004 Declaration that a search is not possible Search / examination 1
04.05.2001 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
20.02.2001 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
20.02.2001 Priority document Search / examination 43
18.12.2000 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
18.12.2000 Priority document Search / examination 24
24.11.2000 Abstract Search / examination 1
24.11.2000 Claims Search / examination 7
24.11.2000 Description Search / examination 23
24.11.2000 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
24.11.2000 Drawings Search / examination 5
24.11.2000 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7