Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1106273

EP1106273 - Vehicle interchangeable repair system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.12.2005
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.12.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.01.2006  [2006/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HEIN-WERNER CORPORATION
1005 Perkins Avenue Waukesha
Wisconsin 53186 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/24]For all designated states
HEIN-WERNER CORPORATION
1005 Perkins Avenue
Waukesha Wisconsin 53186 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Ballard, James G.
1107 Greenmeadow Drive
Waukesha, WI 53188 / US
02 / Russell, Jeffrey
109 South Oakshire Drive
Summit, WI 53066 / US
03 / Graham, James C.
149 Walton Avenue
Waukesha, WI 53186 / US
 [2001/24]
Representative(s)Uexküll & Stolberg
Partnerschaft von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Beselerstrasse 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/24]UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG
Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date00126392.004.12.2000
[2001/24]
Priority number, dateUS19990168521P02.12.1999         Original published format: US 168521 P
[2001/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1106273
Date:13.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/24]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1106273
Date:18.12.2002
[2002/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.10.2002
ClassificationInternational:B21D1/14
[2001/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2001/24]
TitleGerman:Auswechselbarer Reparaturstand für Fahrzeuge[2005/16]
English:Vehicle interchangeable repair system[2001/24]
French:Système de réparation pour véhicules interchangeable[2005/16]
Former [2001/24]AUSWECHSELBARER REPARATURSTAND FÜR FAHRZEUGE
Former [2001/24]SYSTEME DE REPARATION POUR VEHICULES INTERCHANGEABLE
Examination procedure17.06.2003Examination requested  [2003/34]
10.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.03.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.07.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/04]
25.08.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2006/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
29.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
23.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5287722  (ECK LEONARD F [US]) [X] 1,3,5-7,10,12,14 * column 2, line 17 - line 39 * [Y] 2,4,8,9,11,13;
 [Y]US4313335  (ECK LEONARD F) [Y] 2,4,8,9,11,13 * figures 3,8,13,14 *